EP2090886 - Method for optimising the voltage distribution in acoustic thermography applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Homma, Christian Schubertstr. 10 85591, Vaterstetten / DE | 02 /
Broddegaard, Mattias Kastanjegatan 13 61433, Söderköping / SE | 03 /
Rothenfusser, Max Pfingstrosenstr. 15 81377, München / DE | [2009/34] | Application number, filing date | 09150992.7 | 21.01.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | DE20081008609 | 12.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008008609 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2090886 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2090886 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/30, G01N29/44, G01N29/12 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
G01N29/4472 (EP,US);
G01N29/12 (EP,US);
G01N29/30 (EP,US);
G01N29/4418 (EP,US);
G01N2291/014 (EP,US);
G01N2291/2693 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | G01N29/30, G01N29/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Optimierung der Spannungsverteilung bei Anwendungen akustischer Thermographie | [2009/34] | English: | Method for optimising the voltage distribution in acoustic thermography applications | [2009/34] | French: | Procédé d'optimisation de la répartition de tension dans des applications de thermographie acoustique | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 04.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5886263 (NATH ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5493511 (WINCHESKI BUZZ A [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 46 * * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 50 * * column 10, line 18 - line 47 * | by applicant | EP1582867 |