EP2091271 - In-the-ear hearing aid with mobile gripping element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd. Block 28, Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08 Singapore 139959 / SG | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weigert, Roland Gebbertstrasse, 124 91058, Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Benjamin Wehefritzstraße, 11 90419, Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Singer, Erwin Behringstrasse, 50 90542, Eckental / DE | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09151001.6 | 21.01.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | DE20081009186 | 15.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008009186 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2091271 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2091271 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/02, H04R25/00 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
H04R25/556 (EP,US);
H04R2225/025 (EP,US);
H04R2225/31 (EP,US);
H04R2225/61 (EP,US);
H04R25/603 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | H04R25/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | In-dem-Ohr-Hörgerät mit bewegbarem Griffelement | [2009/34] | English: | In-the-ear hearing aid with mobile gripping element | [2009/34] | French: | Prothèse auditive intra-auriculaire avec élément de prise mobile | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 15.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 01.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5712919 (RUHLING DALE M [US]) [X] 1-2,5 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 28; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 3-4,6-7,10 [Y] 8-9; | [Y]DE4215711 (RION CO [JP]) [Y] 8-9 * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 7; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]WO9104644 (RESOUND CORP [US]) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5717771 (SAUER JOSEPH [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,6,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5712919 | DE4215711 | WO9104644 | US5717771 |