EP2080815 - Apparatus for processing sugarcane crop and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Farion, Walter 428-24th Avenue N.E. Calgary Alberta T2E 1X1 / CA | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09151004.0 | 21.01.2009 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | US20080009856 | 21.01.2008 Original published format: US 9856 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2080815 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2080815 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C13C1/02, B27J1/00, D01B1/10, C13D1/02 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
C13B10/025 (EP,US);
C13B5/02 (EP,US);
D01B9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | C13C1/02, B27J1/00, D01B1/10 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/51] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung der Zuckerrohrernte und Verwendungsverfahren | [2009/30] | English: | Apparatus for processing sugarcane crop and method of use | [2009/30] | French: | Appareil pour le traitement de récoltes de canne à sucre et son procédé d'utilisation | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3976498 (TILBY SYDNEY EDWARD, et al) [I] 1-11 * column 10, line 30 - column 11, line 57; figures 1-17; claims 1,4-8,11-13 *; | [I]CA1188948 (MASON WILLIAM C W) [I] 1-11 * page 19, line 1 - page 21, line 10; figure 13; claim 1 * * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 16; figures 13,14 *; | [I]US4572741 (MASON WILLIAM [CA]) [I] 1-11 * column 8, line 57 - column 10, line 14; figures 13,14; claims 1,23 *; | [A]US3690358 (TILBY SYDNEY EDWARD) [A] 1-11 * page 8, line 42 - page 12, line 48; figure 9 *; | [AD]US5116422 (TILBY SYNDEY E [CA]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5374316 (TILBY SYDNEY E [CA]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3464877 | US3464881 | US3567510 | US3698459 | US3796809 | US4025278 | US4231136 | US4636263 | US4961952 | US5106645 | US5116422 | US5374316 | CA789214 | CA1006410 |