EP2090442 - Pneumatic tyres for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2010/02] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welge, Konrad Am Kleegarten 2 31535 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Rittweger, Stefan Dennewitzstrasse 2 30163 Hannover / DE | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Finger, Karsten, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 1 69 30001 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 09151165.9 | 23.01.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | DE20081009325 | 15.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008009325 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2090442 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2090442 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/03 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
B60C11/0302 (EP);
B60C11/12 (EP);
B60C11/1392 (EP);
B60C2011/0381 (EP);
B60C2011/1213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugluftreifen | [2009/34] | English: | Pneumatic tyres for a vehicle | [2009/34] | French: | Pneus de véhicule | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2009 | CY | 25.05.2011 | CZ | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | FI | 25.05.2011 | HR | 25.05.2011 | IE | 25.05.2011 | IT | 25.05.2011 | LT | 25.05.2011 | LV | 25.05.2011 | MK | 25.05.2011 | MT | 25.05.2011 | NL | 25.05.2011 | PL | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | SI | 25.05.2011 | SK | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | ES | 05.09.2011 | IS | 25.09.2011 | PT | 26.09.2011 | LU | 23.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | FR | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MK | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MK | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MK | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MK | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MK | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
PT | 26.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5967210 (HIMURO YASUO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 10, line 51 - line 63; figures 4a,4c; claim - *; | [X]EP1410927 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0003] , [0012]; figure -; claim - *; | [XP]EP1918130 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-5* column 6 - column 7; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | WO03013881 |