EP2045066 - Method for injection molding with direct insert thermal control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/15] | Method and apparatus for injection molding with direct insert thermal control | ||
[2018/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gentex Optics, Inc. 324 Main Street Simpson, PA 18407 / US | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weymouth, Russell F. 87 Daniels Road Charlton, MA 01507 / US | [2009/29] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Weymouth Jr., Russell F. 87 Daniels Road Charlton, MA 01507 / US | ||
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
Waymouth Jr., Russell F. 87 Daniels Road Charlton, MA 01507 / US | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 09151356.4 | 07.07.2006 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | US20050178203 | 08.07.2005 Original published format: US 178203 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2045066 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2045066 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2045066 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/73, B29C45/26, B29C45/37, B29C33/30, B29C45/00, B29D11/00, // B29C45/17 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
B29C45/376 (EP,US);
B29C45/0001 (EP,US);
B29C45/2675 (EP,US);
B29C45/73 (EP,US);
B29D11/00413 (EP,US);
B29C45/1775 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | B29C45/73, B29C45/26, B29C45/37, B29C33/30, B29C45/00, // B29D11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/15] | B29C45/73, B29C45/26, B29C45/37, B29C33/30, // B29D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Spritzgiessen mit einer direkten Wärmeregelung des Einsatzes | [2018/02] | English: | Method for injection molding with direct insert thermal control | [2018/02] | French: | Méthode pour le moulage par injection avec un contrôle thermique direct de l'insert | [2018/02] |
Former [2009/15] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Spritzgiessen mit einer direkten Wärmeregelung des Einsatzes | ||
Former [2009/15] | Method and apparatus for injection molding with direct insert thermal control | ||
Former [2009/15] | Méthode et dispositif pour le moulage par injection avec un contrôle thermique direct de l'insert | Examination procedure | 07.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 22.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06253587.7 / EP1741539 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060253587) is 21.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2006 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | ES | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | IT | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | IE | 07.07.2018 | LU | 07.07.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.07.2006 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 07.07.2006 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5512221 (MAUS STEVEN M [US], et al) [DX] 1,7-10 * column 9, lines 18-33 * * column 11, lines 27-52 * * figures 1-4 *; | [DX]US5792392 (MAUS STEVEN M [US], et al) [DX] 1,6-10 * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 19 * * column 8, lines 44-61 * * column 10, line 65 - column 11, line 14 ** figures 1-4,6 * | by applicant | US4664854 | US5512221 | US5783233 | US5792392 | US5792492 | US6156242 | US6290882 |