EP2050355 - Oral care implement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2017/10] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | ||
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hohlbein, Douglas Joseph 134 Reservoir Road Hopewell, NJ 08525 / US | [2013/08] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
Hohlbein, Douglas Joseph 45 Diverty Road Pennington, NJ 08534 / US | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Thum, Bernhard, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/12] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2009/17] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09151874.6 | 29.11.2004 | [2009/17] | Priority number, date | US20040869922 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: US 869922 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2050355 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2050355 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2050355 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A46B15/00, A61B17/24, A46B9/04 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
A46B15/0081 (EP,US);
A46B1/00 (US);
A46B15/0002 (EP,US);
A46B15/0032 (EP,US);
A46B15/0055 (EP,US);
A46B15/0075 (US);
A46B3/005 (US);
A46B9/005 (US);
A46B9/026 (EP,US);
A46B9/028 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (US);
A46B9/06 (EP,US);
A46D3/00 (US);
A61B17/244 (EP,US);
A61H13/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mundpflegegerät | [2009/17] | English: | Oral care implement | [2009/17] | French: | Outil de protection orale | [2009/17] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04078237.7 / EP1607059 | EP08161935.5 / EP1985199 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040078237) is 24.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.10.2014
19.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC / Unilever N.V. Colworth House/ Weena 455 Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / 3013 AL Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | 02
18.12.2014
08.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative O'Callaghan, Robert James Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.10.2014
19.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC / Unilever N.V. Colworth House/ Weena 455 Shambrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / 3013 AL Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
02
18.12.2014
08.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative O'Callaghan, Robert James Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | |||
Former [2015/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.10.2014
19.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC / Unilever N.V. Colworth House/ Weena 455 Shambrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / 3013 AL Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
02
18.12.2014
08.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Frankfurter Str. 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | |||
Former [2015/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.10.2014
19.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC / Unilever N.V. Colworth House/ Weena 455 Shambrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / 3013 AL Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Johnstone, Helen Margaret Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
02
18.12.2014
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Frankfurter Str. 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | |||
Former [2014/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC / Unilever N.V. Colworth House/ Weena 455 Shambrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / 3013 AL Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | 27.01.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.07.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.06.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.11.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.01.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.08.2016 | Appeal received No. T1925/16 | 18.11.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2004 | AT | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | NL | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | LU | 29.11.2014 | [2020/32] |
Former [2017/47] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 29.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4585416 (DENIRO RICHARD G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0145573 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP1350442 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2391462 (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004026162 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2004255416 | Opposition | US1125532 | US2418485 | WO9808458 | WO9818364 | WO9933374 | US6119296 | WO0145573 | US2003116884 | EP1350442 | GB2391462 | WO2004026162 |