EP2065395 - Gene expression associated with osteoblast differentiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states NOVARTIS AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Susa Spring, Mira Markircherstr. 34 4055, Basel / CH | 02 /
Zamurovic, Natasa Klingentalstr. 79 4057, Basel / CH | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Spinner, David Richard, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Spinner, David Richard, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 09151973.6 | 05.04.2004 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | US20030462834P | 14.04.2003 Original published format: US 462834 P | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065395 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6813 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | Genexpression, die mit Osteoblastendifferenzierung assoziiert ist | [2009/23] | English: | Gene expression associated with osteoblast differentiation | [2009/23] | French: | Expression génétique associée avec la différenciation des ostéoblastes | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04725691.2 / EP1616026 | EP07119293.4 / EP1923401 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0119855 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02081745 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-17 * whole document, in particular page 41 and Figure 8 *; | [Y] - CHUNG Y ET AL, "EFFECTS OF SECRETED FRIZZLED-RELATED PROTEIN (SFRP)-3 ON OSTEOBLASTS IN VITRO: SFRP-3 IS A STIMULATOR OF OSTEOBLAST DIFFERENTIATION", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020901), vol. 17, no. SUPPL. 01, ISSN 0884-0431, page S168, XP009051810 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - VAES B L T ET AL, "COMPREHENSIVE MICROARRAY ANALYSIS OF BONE MORPHOGENETIC PROTEIN 2-INDUCED OSTEOBLAST DIFFERENTIATION RESULTING IN THE IDENTIFICATION OF NOVEL MARKERS FOR BONE DEVELOPMENT", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20021201), vol. 17, no. 12, ISSN 0884-0431, pages 2106 - 2118, XP009032948 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/jbmr.2002.17.12.2106 | [PX] - OSHIMA T ET AL, "MYELOMA CELLS EXPRESS BMP-2 AND WNT ANTAGONISTS: A MECHANISM OF IMPAIRED BONE FORMATION IN MULTIPLE MYELOMA", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20031116), vol. 102, no. 11, ISSN 0006-4971, page 930A, XP009051818 [PX] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5143854 | WO9309668 | WO9511755 | WO9932660 | US5953727 | - KARSENTY, SEMIN CELL DEV BIO, (2000), vol. 11, pages 343 - 346 | - NAKASHIMA ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 108, pages 17 - 29 | - QI ET AL., PNAS USA, (2003), vol. 100, no. 6, pages 3305 - 10 | - DE JONG ET AL., J BONE MINER RES., (2002), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 2119 - 29 | - VAES ET AL., J BONE MINER RES., (2002), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 2106 - 18 | - MARSHALL, CELL, (1991), vol. 64, pages 313 - 326 | - WEINBERG, SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1138 - 1146 | - LOCKHART ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 14, pages 1675 - 1680 | - MCGALL ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 13555 - 13460 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 485 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 445 | - DAYHOFF, Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, NATIONAL BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, (1979), page 353 | - SLAM ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 15, no. 188, pages 245 - 254 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 25 | - MEYERS, Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, VCH PUBLISHERS, (1995), pages 659 - 664 | - SUDO ET AL., J CELL BIOL, (1983), vol. 96, pages 191 - 198 | - QUARLES ET AL., J. BONE MINER RES, (1992), vol. 7, pages 683 - 692 | - CONOVER, Principles of Bone Biology, (1996), pages 607 - 618 | - SWARTHOUT ET AL., GENE, (2002), vol. 282, pages 1 - 17 | - KIM; BALLOCK, J CELL BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 77, pages 169 - 78 | - WNT, GONG ET AL., CELL, (2001), vol. 107, pages 513 - 523 | - MALAVAL; AUBIN, J CELL BIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 81, no. S36, pages 63 - 70 | - GORDELADZE ET AL., CURR PHARM DES, (2001), vol. 7, pages 275 - 290 | - WILKIE, HUM MOL GENET, (1997), vol. 6, pages 1647 - 56 | - MEYER ET AL., PNAS USA, (1999), vol. 97, pages 9197 - 202 | - ALLAN ET AL., CIIN ORTHOP, (1995), vol. 313, pages 54 - 63 | - DECKERS ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2000), vol. 141, pages 1667 - 74 | - URA ET AL., ENDOCR J, (2000), vol. 47, pages 293 - 302 | - HURLEY; FLORKIEWICZ R, Principles of Bone Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., (1996), pages 627 - 645 | - JAY ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1996), vol. 137, pages 1151 - 8 | - CANALIS; RYDZIEL, Principles of Bone Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., (1996), pages 619 - 626 | - PILBEAM ET AL., Principles of Bone Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., (1996), pages 715 - 728 | - LOCKLIN, J BONE MINER RES, (2001), vol. 16, pages 2192 - 204 | - JOCHUM ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, pages 2401 - 12 | - LOPEZ-ROVIRA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 3176 - 85 | - XU ET AL., DNA CELL BIOL, (2001), vol. 20, pages 359 - 65 | - MATSUO ET AL., NAT GENET, (2000), vol. 24, pages 184 - 7 | - BLIN-WAKKACH, PNAS USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 7336 - 41 | - DUCY, SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 289, pages 1501 - 4 | - GONG ET AL., CELL, (2001), vol. 107, pages 513 - 523 | - LITTLE ET AL., AM J HUM GENET, (2002), vol. 70, pages 11 - 9 | - BOYDEN ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2002), vol. 346, pages 1513 - 21 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., ENDOCR REV, (2000), vol. 21, pages 393 - 411 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1999), vol. 256, pages 449 - 55 | - CENCI ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (2000), vol. 105, pages 1279 - 87 | - KIM; BALLOCK, Cellular and Molecular Biology of bone, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), pages 98 - 122 | - HEFFERAN ET AL., J CELL BIOCHEM, (2000), vol. 78, pages 380 - 90 | - MACKIE ET AL., BONE, (1998), vol. 22, pages 301 - 7 | - KIM ET AL., J CELL BIOCHEM, (2000), vol. 77, pages 169 - 78 | - PUENTE ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 13461 - 8 | - WODARZ; NUSSE, ANNU REV CELL DEV BIOL, (1998), vol. 14, pages 59 - 88 | - GONG ET AL., CELL, (2001), vol. 107, pages 513 - 23 | - BAFICO ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL, (2001), vol. 3, pages 683 - 686 | - LEIMEISTERET ET AL., MECH DEV, (1999), vol. 85, pages 173 - 7 | - ISO ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (2001), vol. 21, pages 6071 - 9 | - ISO ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 6598 - 607 | - ARTAVANIS-TSAKONAS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, pages 770 - 6 | - MUMM; KOPAN, DEV BIOL, (2000), vol. 228, pages 151 - 165 | - GREENWALD, GENES DEV, (1998), vol. 12, pages 1751 - 62 | - DALLAS ET AL., BONE, (1999), vol. 25, pages 9 - 15 | - GOTHEL; MARAHIEL, CELL MOL LIFE SCI, (1999), vol. 55, pages 423 - 36 | - TANG ET AL., CELL BIOL INT, (2002), vol. 26, pages 75 - 84 | - MCLATCHIE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, pages 333 - 9 | - COXON ET AL., J BONE MINER RES, (2000), vol. 15, pages 1467 - 1476 | - GARRETT ET AL., CURR PHARM DES, (2001), vol. 7, pages 65 - 70 |