EP2101079 - Belt, in particular power transmission belt, with a coating with a polyisocyanurate-polyuric material as adhesive and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Antriebssysteme GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oehl, Rainer Speicherwinkel 20 30928 Burgwedel / DE | 02 /
Fleck, Andreas Scheelenkamp 10 30827 Garbsen / DE | 03 /
Student, Peter Eupener Strasse 14K 30519 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Mahnken, Claus-Lüder Im Dreieck 14 27367, Ahausen / DE | 05 /
Teves, Reinhard Kurze Wende 4 30926 Seelze / DE | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152001.5 | 04.02.2009 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | DE20081013570 | 11.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008013570 | [2009/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2101079 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2101079 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16G1/28, B29D29/00 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
F16G1/28 (EP);
B29D29/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | Riemen, insbesondere Kraftübertragungsriemen, mit einer Beschichtung mit einem Polyisocyanurat - Polyharnstoff als Bindemittel und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2009/38] | English: | Belt, in particular power transmission belt, with a coating with a polyisocyanurate-polyuric material as adhesive and method for its production | [2009/38] | French: | Courroie, notamment courroie de transmission de puissance, dotée d'une couche de polyisocyanurate-polyurée comme adhésif et son procédé de fabrication | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/39] | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3937094 (CICOGNANI MARIO) [A] 1,10 * column 3 - column 4; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE4436703 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * page 3; figures 1-3; claim 12 *; | [A]EP0655568 (DAYCO PTI SPA [IT]) [A] 1* columns 7,8,11; figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]US6296588 (CIEMNIECKI SCOTT L [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * columns 5,6; figure 1; claims 3-12 *; | [A]DE10230306 (CONTITECH ANTRIEBSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1818567 (CONTITECH ANTRIEBSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document * | Examination | US3933756 | EP0688973 | WO2006137087 | by applicant | EP0317887 | EP0622563 | DE4400434 | EP0599145 | EP0662571 | WO0063281 | EP1108750 | DE10016351 | EP1129308 | EP1088177 | WO2005080821 |