EP2110311 - Finned rudder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Daisuke@Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Nagasaki Research & Development Center 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki Nagasaki 851-0392 / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Toshinobu@Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Nagasaki Research & Development Center 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki Nagasaki 851-0392 / JP | [2013/18] |
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
Matsumoto, Daisuke Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Nagasaki Research & Development Center 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki Nagasaki 851-0392 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakamoto, Toshinobu Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Nagasaki Research & Development Center 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki Nagasaki 851-0392 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152042.9 | 04.02.2009 | [2009/43] | Priority number, date | JP20080109270 | 18.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008109270 | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2110311 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2110311 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110311 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B63H25/38, B63H25/52 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
B63H25/38 (EP);
B63H25/381 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES [2012/24] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flossenruder | [2009/43] | English: | Finned rudder | [2009/43] | French: | Gouverne à ailettes | [2009/43] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 06.04.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]JPH11139395 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [XD] 1,3-5 * figures 1,6b * [A] 2; | [X]EP0472811 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [X] 1,5 * figure 5c *; | [X]JPH0443192 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [X] 1,5 * figure - *; | [A]JPS61278499 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1,2,5 * figures 1,2,3,6 *; | [AD]JPH06305487 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [AD] 1,2,5 * figure 4 *; | [A]WO2006115317 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * figures 1,2, *; | [A]EP0527270 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,5 * figures 1,15 * | by applicant | JPH06305487 | JPH11139395 |