EP2053220 - Control apparatus and control method for an internal combustion engine including plural cylinders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/18] | Internal combustion engine including plural cylinders, and control method for the same | ||
[2018/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2018/37] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiraku, Keizo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Hashizume, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Tsunooka, Takashi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Hirohiko c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 05 /
Yamada, Masakazu c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2018/37] |
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
Hiraku, Keizo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Hashizume, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
Tsunooka, Takashi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
Yamada, Hirohiko c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
05 /
Yamada, Masakazu c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/37] |
Former [2009/18] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152285.4 | 23.06.2004 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | JP20030178848 | 24.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003178848 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053220 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2053220 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D13/02, F02D41/00, F02D41/14, F02D41/18, F02B31/04, F02D15/04, F02D37/02, F02B31/00 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
F02D41/008 (EP,US);
F02B31/04 (US);
F02B31/085 (EP);
F02D13/02 (EP,US);
F02D15/04 (EP,US);
F02D37/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02B2031/006 (US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D2250/18 (EP,US);
F02D41/187 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | F02D13/02, F02D41/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/37] |
Former [2010/01] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung und Steuerverfahren für Verbrennungsmotor der mehrere Zylinder enthält | [2018/14] | English: | Control apparatus and control method for an internal combustion engine including plural cylinders | [2018/14] | French: | Appareil de commande et procédé de commande pour moteur à combustion interne incluant plusieurs cylindres | [2018/14] |
Former [2009/18] | Verbrennungsmotor der mehrere Zylinder enthält, Steuervorrichtung und Steuerverfahren für Verbrennungsmotor der mehrere Zylinder enthält | ||
Former [2009/18] | Internal combustion engine including plural cylinders, and control method for the same | ||
Former [2009/18] | Moteur à combustion interne incluant plusieurs cylindres, appareil de commande et procédé de commande pour moteur à combustion interne incluant plusieurs cylindres | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04014743.1 / EP1491746 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040014743) is 15.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.09.2018 | [2019/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2183062 (DIESEL KIKI CO); | [A]EP0456392 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US5740780 (SHIMIZU HIROKAZU [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0860595 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]); | [A]EP1217191 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP1229230 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | EP0972927 | by applicant | EP1229230 |