EP2216613 - Ice maker and method of producing pieces of ice [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dometic Sweden AB Torggatan 8 171 54 Solna / SE | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergqvist, Anders Idrottsgatan 3, 4 tr 169 35 Solna / SE | 02 /
Wedby, Per Ursviksvägen 29 172 76 Sundbyberg / SE | 03 /
Flemsäter, Björn Motionsvägen 20 181 30 Lidingö / SE | 04 /
Rickman, Jan Sörbyvägen 14 130 40 Djurhamn / SE | 05 /
Hallin, Ingemar Blåklocksvägen 20 181 57 Lidingö / SE | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Wennborg, Johan, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Wennborg, Johan, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09152386.0 | 09.02.2009 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2216613 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/10 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
F25C1/10 (EP,US);
F25C1/243 (EP,US);
F25C2305/022 (EP,US);
F25C5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/16] |
Former [2010/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eismaschine und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Eisstücken | [2010/32] | English: | Ice maker and method of producing pieces of ice | [2010/32] | French: | Dispositif de fabrication de glace et procédé de production de morceaux de glace | [2010/32] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/37] | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3146601 (GOULD RICHARD E) [X] 1-6,8,10,14-16* the whole document *; | [X]US3247682 (JACOBS JAMES W) [X] 1-6,8,10,12,14-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US3253425 (MCKISSICK BURLEIGH H) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,13,14,16 * the whole document *; | [X]US3264844 (KESLING KEITH K) [X] 1-8,10,12,14-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001027654 (SHAPIRO ANDREW PHILIP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,12,14-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US6357720 (SHAPIRO ANDREW PHILIP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10,12,14,16 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1441188 |