EP2216035 - Lactobacillus rhamnosus CNCM I-4096 and weight control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arigoni, Fabrizio 2, rue Maurice 1204, GENEVE / CH | 02 /
Darimont, Christian Av. Montagibert, 10 1005, LAUSANNE / CH | 03 /
Mace, Catherine Av. des Mousquines 27 1005, LAUSANNE / CH | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Marquardt, Ulf Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Marquardt, Ulf Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 09152435.5 | 10.02.2009 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2216035 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A23L1/30, C12R1/225 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L33/14 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
C12R2001/225 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/3204, A23V2200/3202, A23V2250/76, A23V2200/326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | Lactobacillus-rhamnosus-CNCM I-4096 und Gewichtskontrolle | [2010/32] | English: | Lactobacillus rhamnosus CNCM I-4096 and weight control | [2010/32] | French: | Lactobacillus rhamnosus CNCM I-4096 et contrôle de poids | [2010/32] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 14.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US7001756 (HSU CHING-HSIANG [TW], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2006019222 (PL BIO CO LTD [KR], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP1974734 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-11 *; | [A] - LEE H Y ET AL, "Human originated bacteria, Lactobacillus rhamnosus PL60, produce conjugated linoleic acid and show anti-obesity effects in diet-induced obese mice", BIOCHIMICA AND BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR AND CELL BIOLOGY OFLIPIDS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1761, no. 7, ISSN 1388-1981, (20060701), pages 736 - 744, (20060701), XP025180713 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbalip.2006.05.007 | by applicant | CN1670183 | US7001756 | WO2006019222 | - SALMINEN S; OUWEHAND A.; BENNO Y. ET AL., "Probiotics: how should they be defined", TRENDS FOOD SCI. TECHNOL., (1999), vol. 10, pages 107 - 10 | - WRODNIGG, T.M.; STUTZ, A.E., Angew. Chem., (1999), vol. 38, pages 827 - 828 |