EP2093427 - Capacity Varying Device for a Scroll Compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2017/31] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiem, Myung-Kyun 327-23, Gasan-Dong, Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Hwang, Seon-Woong 327-23, Gasan-Dong, Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | [2017/31] |
Former [2009/35] | 01 /
Kiem, Myung-Kyun 327-23, Gasan-Dong, Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Hwang, Seon-Woong 327-23, Gasan-Dong, Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/31] |
Former [2009/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152500.6 | 11.02.2009 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | KR20080015047 | 19.02.2008 Original published format: KR 20080015047 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2093427 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2093427 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2093427 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/02, F04C28/26, F04C28/14 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C18/02 (KR);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F04C28/26 (EP,US);
F04C18/0246 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | F04C18/02, F04C28/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2013/51] |
Former [2009/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kapazitätsvariationsvorrichtung für einen Spiralverdichter | [2009/35] | English: | Capacity Varying Device for a Scroll Compressor | [2009/35] | French: | Dispositif de capacité variable pour compresseur à spirales | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 10.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.08.2017 | GB | 11.02.2018 | [2019/13] |
Former [2018/28] | IT | 02.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004146419 (KAWAGUCHI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,11,13-15 * page 1; figures 1-5 * [I] 5-10,12; | [XI]EP1197661 (COPELAND CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,11,13,14 * page 11 - page 5; figures 1-10 * [I] 12,15; | [XI]US6116867 (WALLIS FRANK S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13 * column 1 - column 6; figures 1-5 * [I] 11,12,15; | [XI]US6176686 (WALLIS FRANK S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13 * column 1 - column 5; figures 1-6 * [I] 11,12,15; | [A]US2006198749 (HWANG SEON-WOONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 3; figures 4-8 * | by applicant | US2004146419 | EP1197661 |