EP2103713 - Anti-corrosion primer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Münch Chemie International GmbH Viernheimer Str. 70-76 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drossmann, Sebastian Leharstrasse 23 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Münch, Michael Im Schwanenklingen 29 A 69488 Birkenau / DE | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152707.7 | 12.02.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | DE20081015213 | 20.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008015213 | DE20081031974 | 07.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008031974 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103713 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/74, C23C22/83, C09D5/00, C09D5/08 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
C23C22/74 (EP);
C09D1/00 (EP);
C09D5/008 (EP);
C09D5/08 (EP);
C23C22/83 (EP);
C23C2222/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Korrosionsschutzgrundierung | [2009/39] | English: | Anti-corrosion primer | [2009/39] | French: | Couche de protection contre la corrosion | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9819798 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * examples 1,2 * * page 1, lines 5-10 * * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 2 * * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 6 * * page 11, lines 13-34 * * claims 1-5,7-25 *; | [X]US2004062873 (JUNG CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 29; examples 37,38 * * page 4, paragraphs 41,42 * * page 5, paragraph 44 * * page 6, paragraphs 58,59,62 * * page 10, paragraphs 104,105 *; | [X]US2005233134 (KANAI TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 9, paragraphs 80-85 - page 10; examples 1,2 * * page 5, paragraph 49 - page 6, paragraph 52 *; | [X]WO2006065819 (AEROMET TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 6, paragraph 20 - page 8, paragraph 24 *; | [X]EP1852523 (NIHON PARKERIZING [JP]) [X] 1-11 * example 1; tables 1-3 * * example 2; table 11 * * examples 5,10; table 11 * * page 4, paragraphs 19,20 * * page 5, paragraphs 29,30 * * page 6, paragraphs 35-37 *; | [X]WO2004032594 (ONDEO NALCO CO [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * example 1 * * page 1, lines 5-10 * * page 3, lines 3-30 * * page 4, lines 7-31 * * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 6 * * claims 1-12 *; | [X]US6723258 (SCHLOSSER TED M [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * column 4, lines 4-61 * * column 5, lines 30-51 * * column 6, lines 1-5 * * examples 1-9 * * claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO2007075050 (POSCO [KR], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11 * example 1; table 2 * * page 5, paragraphs 23,24 * * page 6, paragraphs 27,30 - page 7, paragraph 31 *; | [A]DE102005015576 (CHEMETALL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |