EP2093244 - New polyether alcohols containing alkoxysilyl groups by means of alkoxylisation of epoxide functional alkoxy silanes to double metal cyanide (DMC) catalysts and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Evonik Goldschmidt GmbH Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schubert, Frank, Dr. Wiesfurthstraße 2a 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | 02 /
Knott, Wilfried, Dr. Rechtstr. 9-11 45355 Essen / DE | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Lang, Arne Evonik Goldschmidt GmbH Intellectual Property Management-PATENTE & MARKEN Bau 1042/PB 15 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | Lang, Arne Evonik Goldschmidt GmbH Intellectual Property Management-PATENTE & MARKEN Bau 1042/PB 15 45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Lang, Arne Evonik Goldschmidt GmbH Intellectual Property Management-PATENTE & MARKEN Bau 1042/PB 15 45764 Marl / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152883.6 | 16.02.2009 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | DE20081000360 | 21.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008000360 | [2009/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093244 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2093244 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/26 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C08G18/5096 (EP,US);
C08G63/66 (EP,US);
C08G63/664 (EP,US);
C08G63/695 (EP,US);
C08G63/6952 (EP,US);
C08G64/0266 (EP,US);
C08G64/34 (EP,US);
C08G65/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | Neue Alkoxysilylgruppen tragende Polyetheralkohole durch Alkoxylierung epoxidfunktioneller Alkoxysilane an Doppelmetallcyanid (DMC)-Katalysatoren, sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2009/35] | English: | New polyether alcohols containing alkoxysilyl groups by means of alkoxylisation of epoxide functional alkoxy silanes to double metal cyanide (DMC) catalysts and method for its production | [2009/35] | French: | Alcools de polyéther porteurs de nouveaux groupes alkoxysilyle par alkoxylation d'alkoxysilanes époxydes fonctionnels sur des catalyseurs de cyano-métalliques doubles (DMC) et leur procédé de fabrication | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15161606.7 / EP2918622 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2009 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | HR | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MK | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.02.2009 | |
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MK | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005078036 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 2; example 6; claim - *; | [A]WO2008004482 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | EP2036938 [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * claim - *; | [A]EP1586597 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]WO0121718 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US3446757 (VANDENBERG EDWIN J) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A] - HSIEN-MING KAO, E.A., "Multinuclear solid-state NMR chracterization, ion dissociation, and dynamic properties of lithium-doped organic-inorganic hybrid electrolytes based on ureasils", MACRMOLECULES, (2007), vol. 40, pages 8673 - 8683, XP002529099 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/MA071541C | by applicant | EP1431331 | DE102004007561 | DE69831518T | JPH1121463 | JPH08295805 | JPH0912863 | JPH0912861 | JPH0762222B | US3427256 | US3427334 | US3427335 | US3278457 | US3278458 | US3278459 | US5470813 | US5482908 | EP1017738 | US5777177 | EP0981407 | WO2006002807 | EP1474464 | WO9852689 | US5158922 | US2003119663 | WO0180994 | JP2005215422 | EP0101027 | WO0162826 | - POLYMER (KOREA), (2003), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 265 - 270 |