EP2105331 - Door for accessing a pollen filter for an automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78943 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malaubier, Philippe 47 route de Bazainville 78550, RICHEBOURG / FR | 02 /
Renaud, Fabrice 1 rue des Clairs Matins 91570, BIEVRES / FR | [2009/40] | Application number, filing date | 09153229.1 | 19.02.2009 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | FR20080051936 | 26.03.2008 Original published format: FR 0851936 | [2009/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105331 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2105331 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60H3/06, B62D25/08 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
B60H1/28 (EP);
B60H3/0616 (EP);
B60H3/0641 (EP);
B62D25/081 (EP);
B62D25/24 (EP);
B60H2001/00085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/22] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zugriffsklappe zu einem Pollenfilter für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2009/40] | English: | Door for accessing a pollen filter for an automobile | [2009/40] | French: | Trappe d'acces a un filtre a pollens pour automobile | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2710009 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0588708 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 6, line 47 - line 55; figures 2,3 *; | [A]FR2711548 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]EP0744309 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]); | [A]DE19734146 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]DE102004051198 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) |