EP2096598 - Receptive opportunity presentation of activity-based advertising [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated 3333 Coyote Hill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greene, Daniel H. 1055 Manet Drive No.6 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
Partridge, Kurt 4129 El Camino Way No.u Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
Begole, James 6774 Bollinger Road San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09153306.7 | 20.02.2009 | [2009/36] | Priority number, date | US20080062812 | 04.04.2008 Original published format: US 62812 | US20080032421P | 28.02.2008 Original published format: US 32421 P | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2096598 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2096598 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0251 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0256 (EP,US);
G06Q30/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/43] |
Former [2009/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Empfangsmöglichkeitsabhängige Präsentation von aktivitätsbasierter Werbung | [2009/36] | English: | Receptive opportunity presentation of activity-based advertising | [2009/36] | French: | Présentation d'opportunité réceptive de publicité à base d'activité | [2009/36] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 25.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 09.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/22] | 12.01.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0213552 (GRAVITATE INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0060] * * abstract *; | [X]US2002095333 (JOKINEN JUKKA V [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0067] *; | [X]US2003115098 (KANG DO-WOO [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0050]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2003220835 (BARNES MELVIN L [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0165]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0227] - paragraph [0296] *; | [X]US2004038665 (HOSONO SHIZU [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0049] *; | [X]WO2005025252 (MASSONE MOBILE ADVERTISING SYS [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 14 *; | [X]WO2005101863 (BAYNE ANTHONY J [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 6 - page 17 *; | [X]US2005239495 (BAYNE ANTHONY J [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0074] *; | [X]US7027801 (HALL MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2006240808 (CROLLEY C W [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0045] *; | [X]WO2007109541 (BRUBAKER CURTIS M [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0281] *; | [X]WO2007120571 (PELAGO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] *; | [X]WO2008003089 (NIELSEN MEDIA RES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0100] *; | [PX]US2008103850 (SHEN WEI [CN]) [PX] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0060] * | Examination | US2006203758 |