EP2098110 - Grain processor structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engel, Manfred / Neusträssel 12 66484, Grosssteinhausen / DE | [2011/47] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
Engel, Manfred Neusträssel 12 66484, Grosssteinhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09153576.5 | 25.02.2009 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | DE20081012487 | 04.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008012487 | [2009/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2098110 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2098110 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2098110 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01D43/10, B02C4/38 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
A01D43/10 (EP,US);
A01D82/00 (EP,US);
B02C4/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | Körnerprozessorzusammenbau | [2009/37] | English: | Grain processor structure | [2009/37] | French: | Assemblage de processeur de grain | [2011/26] |
Former [2009/37] | Assemblage de compresseur de pointeau | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 27.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2009 | CY | 23.11.2011 | CZ | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | HR | 23.11.2011 | IE | 23.11.2011 | IT | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | LV | 23.11.2011 | MK | 23.11.2011 | MT | 23.11.2011 | NL | 23.11.2011 | PL | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | TR | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | NO | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | LU | 25.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | ES | 05.03.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
LU | 25.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0190241 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 5; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0429658 (SATAKE ENG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 58 * [Y] 5,6; | [A]DE4216807 (WIRTH MUEHLENBAU DRESDEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 2, lines 46-58 *; | [A]EP0598705 (BUEHLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4* abstract *; | [DX]DE8817251U (BUEHLER AG [CH]) [DX] 1,2,4 * enthält als Teilaspekt die Verstelltechnik aus Dokument 3; page 14; figure 2 *; | [DY]EP1600049 (CNH BELGIUM NV [BE]) [DY] 5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - [0019] * | by applicant | DE8817251U | EP1166619 | DE10128052 | DE10235241 | EP1600049 |