EP2224270 - Fibre optic probe comprising a mode converting fibre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Artyushenko, Viacheslav Neckarsulmerstrasse 11c 12247 Berlin / DE | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09153808.2 | 26.02.2009 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2224270 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, // G02B6/14, G01N21/47 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
G02B6/4298 (EP,US);
G01N21/552 (EP,US);
G02B6/14 (EP,US);
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
G02B6/4206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | Glasfasersonde mit einer Modenkonversionsfaser | [2010/35] | English: | Fibre optic probe comprising a mode converting fibre | [2010/35] | French: | Sonde à fibre optique avec und fibre convertant les modes | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10002106 (J & M ANALYTISCHE MESS & REGELTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US6144791 (WACH MICHAEL LEONARD [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 41-46,62-65 *; | [A]US6246817 (GRIFFIN STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1 * figures 5-13 * * abstract *; | [A]US2005265678 (MANYAM UPENDRA H [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 2-9 *; | [A] - COONEY T F ET AL, "COMPARATIVE STUDY OF SOME FIBER-OPTIC REMOTE RAMAN PROBE DESIGNS. PART I: MODEL FOR LIQUIDS AND TRANSPARENT SOLIDS", APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, THE SOCIETY FOR APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY. BALTIMORE, US, (19960701), vol. 50, no. 7, ISSN 0003-7028, pages 836 - 848, XP000642339 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1366/0003702963905592 | Examination | US4045667 | US2004008920 | US2006013544 | by applicant | US4045667 | US5754722 | US2004008920 |