EP2098919 - Developer, apparatus and method for image forming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/37] | Image forming apparatus | ||
[2017/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mataumoto, Hayato Oki Data Corporation 11-22 Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2017/39] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
Mataumoto, Hayato Oki Data Corporation 11-22 Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/10] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/37] | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09153961.9 | 27.02.2009 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | JP20080058551 | 07.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008058551 | JP20090036462 | 19.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009036462 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2098919 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2098919 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2098919 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
G03G15/2064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2017/39] |
Former [2011/06] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Toner, Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bilderzeugung | [2017/17] | English: | Developer, apparatus and method for image forming | [2017/17] | French: | Developpeur, appareil et procédé de formation d'images | [2017/17] |
Former [2009/37] | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [2009/37] | Image forming apparatus | ||
Former [2009/37] | Appareil de formation d'images | Examination procedure | 02.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 03.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.03.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006204880 (MIZUTANI NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] , [0018] , [0028] , [0035] , [0039] , [0040] , [0046] , [0050] , [0089] , [0090] , [0101]; example -; table - * [Y] 6-10,12,13; | [Y]US6537716 (DOI SHINJI [JP], et al) [Y] 6-10,12,13 * column 23; figure 5 *; | [A]JP2003246920 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2006047332 | US2006204880 | US6537716 |