EP2060758 - Insulated Reagent Dosing Device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies Holding S.à.r.l. Avenue de Luxembourg 4940 Bascharage / LU | [2010/12] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooke, Michael 52 Burnt Oak Terrace Gillingham, Kent ME7 1DR / GB | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Gregory, John David Charles Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham Kent ME8 0RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Gregory, John David Charles Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham Kent ME8 0RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09154082.3 | 12.06.2007 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | EP20060253655 | 12.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06253655 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060758 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060758 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, B01D53/94 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
B01D53/90 (EP,US);
B01D53/9431 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2067 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/08 (EP,US);
F01N2610/11 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1453 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Isolierte Reagenzdosiervorrichtung | [2009/21] | English: | Insulated Reagent Dosing Device | [2009/21] | French: | Dispositif isolé de dosage de réactif | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07252362.4 / EP1878889 | Divisional application(s) | EP10168050.2 / EP2253814 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2010 | BE | 13.10.2010 | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | LV | 13.10.2010 | MT | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | GB | 12.06.2011 | IE | 12.06.2011 | LU | 12.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 12.06.2011 | ||
IE | 12.06.2011 | ||
LU | 12.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 12.06.2011 | ||
IE | 12.06.2011 | ||
LU | 12.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 12.06.2011 | ||
IE | 12.06.2011 | ||
LU | 12.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 12.06.2011 | ||
IE | 12.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 12.06.2011 | ||
IE | 12.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
IE | 12.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2004030827 (SPRAYING SYSTEMS CO [US], et al) [XD] 1-6,11 * paragraph [0033]; figure 9 *; | [PX]WO2006089704 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,7* page 7, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 2 * | by applicant | US6539708 | WO2004030827 | DE10324482 | EP1561919 |