EP2098321 - Lower blade guard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parks, James R 6 Keil Manor Court White Hall, MD 21161 / US | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09154265.4 | 04.03.2009 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | US20080042401 | 05.03.2008 Original published format: US 42401 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2098321 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2098321 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B27G19/04, B27B9/00, B23D45/16 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
B27B9/00 (EP,US);
B27G19/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/37] | B23D45/16 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2014/36] |
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Unterer Sägeblattschutz | [2009/37] | English: | Lower blade guard | [2009/37] | French: | Protège-lame inférieur | [2009/37] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 08.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5481806 (PRATT EDGAR L [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US5361501 (FAJNSZTAJN ALEKSANDER [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US5396706 (FAJNSZTAJN ALEKSANDER [US]) [X] 1-6 * figure - *; | [X]US2828784 (KESTUTIS DAMIJONAITIS) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 31 - line 60 * * column 3, line 1 - line 10; figures 1,5,7,8 *; | [X]US6202311 (NICKELS JR RICHARD C [US]) [X] 1-3 * figure 4 *; | [X]US3701369 (GRONKE RONALD E, et al) [X] 1,2 * figure - *; | [X]DE3505041 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE3317904 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure - *; | [A]US2671476 (RICHARDS ARCHER W, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 3 *; | [A]US3447577 (BURROWS MILFORD D, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 7 * |