EP2099166 - Electronic control and diagnosis device for operating a valve unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Döhring, Steffen Nordring 15 16278, Angermünde / DE | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Kietzmann, Lutz Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Kietzmann, Lutz Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Benrather Strasse 15 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09154284.5 | 04.03.2009 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | DE20081012730 | 05.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008012730 | [2009/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2099166 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/417 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
H04L12/433 (EP);
H04L2012/40273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | Elektronische Steuer- und Diagnoseeinrichtung zum Betreiben einer Ventileinheit | [2009/37] | English: | Electronic control and diagnosis device for operating a valve unit | [2009/37] | French: | Dispositif de commande et de diagnostic électronique destiné à faire fonctionner une unité de soupape | [2009/37] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 12.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/20] | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1486879 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0020] *; | [A]EP0357992 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 53 *; | [A]US4506360 (KRYSKOW JR J MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 19 *; | [A]US6151306 (OGASAWARA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 51 *; | [A]US5659702 (HASHIMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 8, line 61 - column 10, line 57 *; | [A]JPS6087543 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102004021089 | DE19545566 |