EP2226285 - Lift cabin with a catching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Windlin, Walter / Vorsässring 12 6372, Ennetmoos / CH | 02 /
Dräyer, Reto / Pfruendhofweg 1 8910, Affoltern am Albis / CH | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
Windlin, Walter Vorsässring 12 6372, Ennetmoos / CH | ||
02 /
Dräyer, Reto Pfruendhofweg 1 8910, Affoltern am Albis / CH | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/22] | Application number, filing date | 09154563.2 | 06.03.2009 | [2010/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226285 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2226285 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00, B66B11/02 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
B66B5/0087 (EP);
B66B11/0206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | Aufzugskabine mit einer Fangvorrichtung | [2010/36] | English: | Lift cabin with a catching device | [2010/36] | French: | Cabine d'ascenseur dotée d'un dispositif antichute | [2010/36] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 28.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2009 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | DK | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | FI | 30.05.2012 | HR | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | MK | 30.05.2012 | MT | 30.05.2012 | NL | 30.05.2012 | PL | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SE | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | NO | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | ES | 10.09.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | |
NO | 30.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3346074 (BORDEN JOSEPH H, et al) [DA] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, lines 52-63 * * column 4, lines 9-22 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP1298083 | US3346074 |