EP2062812 - Apparatus and method for adapting a subsea vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Subsea 7 Contracting (UK) Limited East Campus Prospect Road Arnhall Business Park Westhill Aberdeenshire AB32 6FE / GB | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Subsea 7 Contracting (UK) Limited Subsea 7 West Campus Tarland Road Westhill Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB32 6JZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Acergy UK Limited Tarland Road Aberdeen AB32 6JZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mackinnon, Calum Hilton Farm Cottage Colford Peterculter Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB14 0LT / GB | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | Hayden, Nicholas Mark Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09154786.9 | 29.08.2007 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | GB20060017125 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: GB 0617125 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2062812 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2062812 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B63G8/00, B63G8/08 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
B63G8/001 (EP,NO,US);
B63G8/08 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2013/05] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Anpassung eines Unterwasserfahrzeugs | [2009/22] | English: | Apparatus and method for adapting a subsea vehicle | [2009/22] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'adaptation d'un véhicule sous-marin | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07789386.5 / EP2057067 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070789386) is 16.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9113233 (FRAMO DEV LTD [GB]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [A]JPH07223589 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP1031506 (MCDERMOTT SA J RAY [US]) [X] 1-4,6-12,16 * paragraph [0018] * [Y] 5,13,16; | [A]US6167831 (WATT ANDREW M [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0121476 (COFLEXIP [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,14,15 * page 9, line 9 - page 13, line 17; figure - * [Y] 5,13,16; | [A]WO0121479 (COFLEXIP [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 23, line 22 - page 27, line 24 *; | [A]WO0198140 (SUBMERGE APS [DK], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2004053935 (SMART DRILLING AND COMPLETION [US]) [Y] 5,13,16 * page 76, line 14 - page 77, line 30 *; | [A]FR2862043 (MAJASTRE HERVE [FR]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |