EP2151482 - Chemical mechanical polishing composition comprising a copolymer of poly(ethylene glycol) methyl ether (meth)acrylate and 1 -vinylimidazole and methods for polishing a copper substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials CMP Holdings, Inc. 451 Bellevue Road Newark, DE 19713 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials CMP Holdings, Inc. 451 Bellevue Road Newark, DE 19713 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghosh, Tirthankar 502 Filbert Road Oreland, PA 19075 / US | 02 /
Thomas, Terence M. 209 Cullen Way Newark, DE 19711 / US | 03 /
Wang, Hongyu 4901 Plum Run Court Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | 04 /
Ibbitson, Scott A. 121 Pennapacker Road Trappe, PA 19426 / US | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09154939.4 | 11.03.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | US20080185600 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: US 185600 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151482 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D1/04, C09G1/02, H01L21/321 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
C09G1/02 (EP,US);
C09K3/14 (KR);
C09K13/00 (US);
C09G1/04 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H01L21/30625 (US);
H01L21/3212 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/41] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chemisch-mechanische Polierzusammensetzung enthaltend eine Copolymerisat aus polyethylenglykol methyläther (meth)acrylat und 1-vinylimidazole und Verfahren zum polieren von Kupfer Substrate | [2010/06] | English: | Chemical mechanical polishing composition comprising a copolymer of poly(ethylene glycol) methyl ether (meth)acrylate and 1 -vinylimidazole and methods for polishing a copper substrate | [2010/06] | French: | Composition de polissage mécanique et chimique comprenant un copolymèreisat de polyéthylène glycol methyl éther (meth)acrylate et 1 -vinylimidazole et procédés de polissage des substrats en cuivre | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02094957 (RODEL INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 30 - line 31 * * page 3, line 10 * * page 4, line 18 - line 24 * * page 7, line 14 * * page 8, line 14 * * claims 1,3,5-8 *; | [A]WO03053602 (RODEL INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 3 - line 22 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO2005049674 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* example 1; claims 1-10 * | by applicant | WO02094957 | WO03053602 | WO2005049674 |