EP2104349 - Device, computer program, and system for content transmission in a home network using a parental control level determination method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Morihiko c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/48] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
Hayashi, Morihiko c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Pecher, Gilles, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, Rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Pecher, Gilles, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/39] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09154962.6 | 12.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | JP20080063351 | 12.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008063351 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104349 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2104349 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104349 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/173 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N21/26208 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/42202 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/44218 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/4542 (EP,US);
H04N21/4668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4751 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/32] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Computerprogramm, und System für die Übertragung von Inhalten in einem Heimnetzwerk unter Verwendung eines Verfahrens für die Bestimmung der Kindersicherungsstufe | [2009/39] | English: | Device, computer program, and system for content transmission in a home network using a parental control level determination method | [2009/39] | French: | Dispositif, programme d'ordinateur, et système de transmission de contenu dans un réseau domestique utilisant un procédé de détermination du niveau de contrôle parental | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 03.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1530115 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0066] , [0069] , [0074] , [0077] , [0078] * * paragraphs [0094] - [0096] - [0099] * * paragraphs [0121] - [0134] - [0137] - [0170] * [A] 5; | [XA]WO2007036891 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,5-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 1, line 28 - page 4, line 26 * [A] 2-4; | [XA]US2005060740 (STECYK POLLY [US]) [X] 1,5-10 * the whole document * [A] 2-4; | [XA]US7134130 (THOMAS KEITH C [US]) [X] 1,5-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 49 * * column 5, line 43 - line 54 * * column 6, line 52 - column 11, line 34 * [A] 2-4; | [XA]WO2004098190 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [X] 1,7-10 * figures 2,9-14; claims 1-6 * * page 4, line 19 - line 25 * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 27 - line 33 * * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 22 * * page 14, line 31 - line 33 * * page 16, line 10 - line 29 * * page 17, line 7 - page 18, line 15 * [A] 2-6; | [A]US2004117831 (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 47,48 * * paragraphs [0198] - [0212] * | by applicant | JP2008063351 | JP2006197432 |