EP2228658 - Method for producing an analytical consumable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [2011/16] |
Former [2010/37] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwöbel, Wolfgang Gewerbstrasse 24 68309 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Dreibholz, Jörg Wilhelnstrasse 23 67122 Altrip / DE | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Stössel, Matthias, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Stössel, Matthias, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Bad Kreuznacher Strasse 27-29 68309 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09155088.9 | 13.03.2009 | [2010/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228658 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
G01N35/00029 (EP,US);
G01N35/00 (KR);
B32B38/0008 (US);
B05C11/00 (US);
G01N23/00 (KR);
G01N33/48 (KR);
G01N35/00732 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00168 (EP,US);
G01N35/00009 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/20] |
Former [2010/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines analytischen Verbrauchsmittels | [2010/37] | English: | Method for producing an analytical consumable | [2010/37] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un moyen de consommation analytique | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 21.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2040079 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2055472 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [E] 1-15 * figures 5,10 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] *; | [X]WO2008138473 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-2 * * page 6, line 22 - page 6, line 15 *; | [X]EP0371572 (ICR RESEARCH ASSOCIATES INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 9-14 * * column 11, line 25 - column 12, line 10 *; | [X]EP1826705 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0052] *; | [A]EP1593434 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19849539 | EP0299517 |