EP2113447 - Automobile structure, method for manufacturing same, and vehicle comprising such a structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/45] | Automobile structure, method for manufacturing same, and vehicle comprising such a structure. | ||
[2010/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gavillon, Paul 7 rue des Lilas 25490, DAMPIERRE LES BOIS / FR | 02 /
Varlot, Damien 2 rue Alfred Péchin 90500, BEAUCOURT / FR | [2009/45] | Application number, filing date | 09155714.0 | 20.03.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | FR20080052871 | 29.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0852871 | [2009/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113447 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113447 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/08, B62D25/14, B62D29/00 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
B62D25/145 (EP);
B62D25/081 (EP);
B62D29/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2010/27] |
Former [2009/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugstruktur, ihr Herstellungsverfahren und Fahrzeug, das eine solche Struktur umfasst | [2009/45] | English: | Automobile structure, method for manufacturing same, and vehicle comprising such a structure | [2010/23] | French: | Structure de véhicule automobile, son procédé de fabrication, et véhicule comportant une telle structure | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/45] | Automobile structure, method for manufacturing same, and vehicle comprising such a structure. | Examination procedure | 02.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 05.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2878809 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [AD] 1,9,11 * abstract *; | [A]FR2874577 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1,9,11 * abstract *; | [A]US2003057737 (BOCK LOTHAR JOSEF [US], et al) [A] 1,9,11 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2878809 |