EP2233048 - Open display system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STI-Gustav Stabernack GmbH Richard-Stabernack-Strasse 1 36341 Lauterbach / DE | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Füg, Jörg Im Oberdorf 7a 36355, Grebenhain / DE | [2011/47] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
Füg, Jörg Im Oberdorf 7a 36355, Grebenhain / DE | Representative(s) | Simandi, Claus Simandi Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 45 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Simandi, Claus Patentanwalt Höhenstrasse 26 53773 Hennef / Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2010/39] | Simandi, Claus Patentanwalt Höhenstrasse 26 53773 Hennef / Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 09155933.6 | 23.03.2009 | [2010/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233048 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2233048 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/04 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A47F5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | Offenes Display-System | [2011/47] | English: | Open display system | [2010/39] | French: | Système d'affichage ouvert | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/39] | Offenes display-system | Examination procedure | 27.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 17.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2009 | CY | 23.11.2011 | CZ | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | HR | 23.11.2011 | IE | 23.11.2011 | IT | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | LV | 23.11.2011 | MK | 23.11.2011 | MT | 23.11.2011 | NL | 23.11.2011 | PL | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | TR | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | NO | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | ES | 05.03.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | LU | 23.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
LU | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6386491 (BISSETT KEVIN J [US]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-6 *; | [A]JP2006129918 (OKAMURA CORP) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * | Examination | US3295671 | by applicant | DE29810053U | DE19860305 | DE20018744U |