EP2233115 - Dental appliance for adjusting the position of the lower jaw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valceschini, Michel Place de la Gare A, rez 1610 Châtillens/Oron / CH | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Ganguillet, Cyril ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 09156021.9 | 24.03.2009 | [2010/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233115 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/56 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A61F5/566 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/22] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zahnärztlicher Apparat zur Korrektur der Position des Unterkiefers | [2010/39] | English: | Dental appliance for adjusting the position of the lower jaw | [2010/39] | French: | Appareil dentaire pour le réglage du positionnement du maxillaire inférieur | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/40] | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5868138 (HALSTROM LEONARD WAYNE [CA]) [Y] 1-6 * column 9, line 13 - column 10, line 21; figures 12-22 *; | [Y]WO2006058514 (TOUSSAINT WINFRIED [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * page 18, lines 1-16; figures 13a-c *; | [A]WO2008060122 (LEE SEUNG-KYU [KR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2007292819 (SCARBERRY EUGENE N [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2006174897 (SARKISIAN EDVARD [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10341260 |