EP2113641 - Device for phase shifting the rotation angle of a drive wheel for a main shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nowak, Martin Am Kreispark 28 51379 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Dismon, Heinrich Fasanenstr. 28 52538, Gangelt / DE | 03 /
Grimm, Dr., Karsten Südstr. 16-18 52064, Aachen / DE | [2011/41] |
Former [2009/45] | 01 /
Nowak, Martin Essenerstr. 16 40476, Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
Dismon, Heinrich Fasanenstr. 28 52538, Gangelt / DE | |||
03 /
Grimm, Dr., Karsten Südstr. 16-18 52064, Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | terpatent PartGmbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Patentanwälte ter Smitten Burgunderstr. 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/45] | Patentanwälte ter Smitten Burgunder Strasse 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156095.3 | 25.03.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | DE20081021220 | 28.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008021220 | [2009/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2113641 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2113641 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113641 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/352, F16D3/10, F16H1/36, F16H35/00 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
F01L1/352 (EP,US);
F01L1/024 (EP,US);
F16H35/008 (EP,US);
F01L2001/0475 (EP,US);
F16H1/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/45] | F01L1/352 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Phasenverschiebung des Drehwinkels eines Antriebsrades zu einer Abtriebswelle | [2009/45] | English: | Device for phase shifting the rotation angle of a drive wheel for a main shaft | [2009/45] | French: | Dispositif de décalage de phase de l'angle de rotation d'une roue motrice vers un arbre entraîné | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2009 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | HR | 16.11.2011 | IE | 16.11.2011 | IT | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | MK | 16.11.2011 | MT | 16.11.2011 | NL | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | NO | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | LU | 25.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
LU | 25.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MK | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE7337206U (MASCHINENFABRIK WEINGARTEN AG) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5 [I] 6; | [Y]US1317075 (ELVIN T COUSE) [Y] 5 * figure 6 *; | [A]DE1425793 (HEATON HARRY) [A] 1,4* figures 1,3 *; | [I]DE2842154 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK) [I] 1,4,6 * page 19, line 16 - page 26, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US5415595 (NELSON BERTEL S [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 22 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,2 * [I] 4,6; | [A]US5680837 (PIERIK RONALD JAY [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 5 - column 5; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2004035997 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [Y] 2,3 * page 15, line 10 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [XP]WO2008125569 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1,4,5 * page 6, line 1 - page 10, line 16; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE7337206U | DE2842154 | US5680836 | DE102005018956 | WO2008125569 |