EP2112112 - Paper Folding Device And Image Forming Apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Limited 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishizuka, Junichi c/o Ricoh Unitechno Co., Ltd. 713, Tsurugasone Yashio-shi Saitama / JP | [2013/07] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
Ishizuka, Junichi c/o Ricoh Unitechno Co., Ltd. 713, Tsurugasone, Yashio-shi Japan Saitama / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156179.5 | 25.03.2009 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | JP20080113977 | 24.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008113977 | JP20090033119 | 16.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009033119 | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2112112 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2112112 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2112112 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/20 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
B65H45/20 (EP);
B65H2511/528 (EP);
B65H2601/11 (EP);
B65H2801/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2011/49] |
Former [2009/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Papierfaltvorrichtung und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2009/44] | English: | Paper Folding Device And Image Forming Apparatus | [2009/44] | French: | Dispositif de pliage de papier et appareil de formation d'images | [2009/44] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 20.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | FR | 31.03.2013 | [2016/26] |
Former [2014/03] | IT | 27.02.2013 | |
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | NL | 27.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006205580 (SEKINE NORIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0145] - [0155] - [0092] , [0093]; figures 3,4,18,19,34 *; | [A]EP0869401 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 39 * * column 6, lines 3-33 * * column 8, line 10 - column 9, line 2 * * column 9, line 28 - column 12, line 3; figure - *; | [AD]JPH05238595 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2006321648 | JP2005335903 | JPH0811656B | US2006205580 | EP0869401 |