EP2070939 - Modulators of pharmacological agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University Office of Licensing & Ventures 2812 Erwin Road, Suite 306 Box 90083 Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2014/27] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Duke University Office of Science and Technology, P.O. Box 90083 Durham, NC 27708-0083 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sullenger, Bruce A. St. Andrews Court Durham, NC 27707 / US | 02 /
Rusconi, Christopher 1429 Pennsylvania Avenue Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2014/14] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Sullenger, Bruce A. St. Andrews Court Durham, NC 27707 / US | ||
02 /
Rusconi, Christopher 1429 Pennsylvania Avenue Durham, NC 27705 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/25] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156205.8 | 28.05.2002 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | US20010293231P | 25.05.2001 Original published format: US 293231 P | US20010331037P | 07.11.2001 Original published format: US 331037 P | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070939 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070939 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C12N15/115 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N15/1137 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C12N15/115 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21022 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | C07H21/04, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Modulatoren von pharmakologischen Wirkstoffen | [2009/25] | English: | Modulators of pharmacological agents | [2009/25] | French: | Modulateurs d'agents pharmacologiques | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02739409.7 / EP1401853 | Divisional application(s) | EP10181597.5 / EP2364990 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020739409) is 13.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.04.2014 | [2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0127263 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al); | [A] - RUSCONI C P ET AL, "BLOCKING THE INITIATION OF COAGULATION BY RNA APTAMERS TO FACTOR VIIA", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, STUTTGART, DE, (200011), vol. 84, no. 5, ISSN 0340-6245, pages 841 - 848, XP008021933 | [A] - OSBORNE SCOTT E ET AL, "Aptamers as therapeutic and diagnostic reagents: Problems and prospects", CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (199706), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1367-5931, pages 5 - 9, XP002280742 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1367-5931(97)80102-0 | [A] - HICKE BRIAN J ET AL, "Escort aptamers: A delivery service for diagnosis and therapy", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (200010), vol. 106, no. 8, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 923 - 928, XP002280743 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI11324 | [A] - WHITE REBEKAH R ET AL, "Developing aptamers into therapeutics", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (200010), vol. 106, no. 8, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 929 - 934, XP002280744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI11325 | by applicant | US5621092 | US4415732 | US4458066 | US4500707 | US4668777 | US4973679 | WO9119813 | US5153319 | US5180818 | US5245022 | US5270163 | US5278302 | US5453496 | US5459015 | US5472841 | US5475096 | US5476766 | US5496938 | US5503978 | US5512462 | US5527894 | US5534408 | US5539082 | US5543293 | US5565327 | US5567588 | US5580737 | US5582981 | US5585269 | US5587468 | US5595877 | US5597696 | US5599917 | US5602244 | EP0593901 | US5622828 | US5629155 | US5629407 | US5631156 | US5631146 | US5635615 | US5637461 | US5637682 | US5637459 | US5639868 | US5639428 | US5641629 | US5648214 | US5650275 | US5654151 | US5656739 | US5656467 | US5658738 | US5660985 | US5660855 | US5663064 | US5668264 | US5668265 | US5670637 | US5670633 | US5674685 | US5681702 | US5683867 | US5686242 | US5686592 | US5688935 | US5688670 | US5693502 | US5696249 | US5698442 | US5698426 | US5698401 | US5705337 | US5707796 | US5712375 | US5723323 | US5723594 | US5723592 | US5723289 | US5726017 | US5726014 | US5731144 | US5731424 | US5734034 | US5733732 | US5739305 | US5750342 | US5756291 | US5756287 | US5756296 | US5760202 | US5763173 | US5763595 | US5763566 | US5763177 | US5766853 | US5770434 | US5773598 | US5780221 | US5780228 | US5780610 | WO9830720 | US5783566 | US5786462 | US5786203 | US5786145 | US5789163 | US5789160 | US5789157 | US5789573 | US5795721 | US5804390 | US5811533 | US5814476 | US5817785 | US5827456 | US5834199 | US5834184 | US5837834 | US5837456 | US5837838 | US5840867 | US5840580 | US5843653 | US5843732 | US5846713 | US5849479 | US5849890 | US5853984 | US5859228 | US5858660 | US5861254 | US5864026 | US5864010 | US5866334 | US5869641 | US5871924 | US5874557 | US5874218 | US5935776 | US5958691 | US5962219 | US5972599 | US5986053 | US5989823 | US5998142 | US6001988 | US6001577 | US6001570 | US6005087 | US6011020 | US6013443 | US6020483 | US6020130 | US6022691 | US6028186 | US6030776 | US6046307 | US6048698 | US6051698 | US6080585 | US6083696 | US6110900 | US6114120 | US6124449 | US6127119 | US6140490 | US6147204 | US6153737 | US6165720 | US6168778 | US6171795 | US6177557 | US6177555 | US6180348 | US6184364 | US6183967 | US6207816 | US6207388 | US6222025 | US6221587 | US6225063 | US6229002 | US6232071 | US6242246 | US6253168 | US6261783 | US6261774 | US6264825 | US6280943 | US6280932 | US6287765 | US6291184 | US6300074 | US6303316 | US6306598 | US6316198 | US6329145 | US6329146 | US6331398 | US6331394 | US6342393 | US6344321 | US6344318 | US6346611 | US6355787 | US6355431 | WO0226932 | US6376474 | US6376190 | US6379900 | US6383752 | US6387635 | US6387620 | - TUERK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 505 - 10 | - FLOEGE ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (1999), vol. 154, pages 169 - 179 | - OSTENDORFET, J CLIN INVEST, (1999), vol. 104, pages 913 - 923 | - OSTENDORF ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (1999), vol. 104, pages 913 - 923 | - GRIFFIN ET AL., BLOOD, (1993), vol. 81, pages 3271 - 3276 | - HICKE ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (2000), vol. 106, pages 923 - 928 | - WILLIS ET AL., BIOCONJUG CHEM, (1998), vol. 9, pages 573 - 582 | - TUCKER ET AL., J CHROMATOGRBIOMED SCI APPL, (1999), vol. 732, pages 203 - 212 | - WATSON ET AL., ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV, (2000), vol. 10, pages 63 - 75 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1997), vol. 94, page 11285 | - LEVA, CHEM. BIOL., (2002), vol. 9, page 351 | - RISCONI ET AL., THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (2000), vol. 83, pages 841 - 848 | - WHITE ET AL., J. CLIN INVEST, (2000), vol. 106, pages 929 - 34 | - ISHIZAKI ET AL., NAT MED, (1996), vol. 2, pages 1386 - 1389 | - LEE ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 15, pages 41 - 45 | - ALDAZ-CARROLL L ET AL., "Apical loop-internal loop interactions: a new RNA-RNA recognition motif identified through in vitro selection against RNA hairpins of the hepatitis C virus mRNA", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20020507), vol. 41, no. 18, pages 5883 - 93 | - DARFEUILLE F ET AL., "RNA and N3'-->P5' kissing aptamers targeted to the trans-activation responsive (TAR) RNA of the human immunodeficiency virus-I", NUCLEOSIDES NUCLEOTIDES NUCLEIC ACIDS, (200104), vol. 20, no. 4-7, pages 441 - 9 | - COLLIN D ET AL., "NMR characterization of a kissing complex formed between the TAR RNA element of HIV-1 and a DNA aptamer", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20000901), vol. 28, no. 17, pages 3386 - 91 | - DUCONGE F; DI PRIMO C; TOULME JJ., "Is a closing "GA pair" a rule for stable loop-loop RNA complexes", JBIOL CHEM., (20000714), vol. 275, no. 28, pages 21287 - 94 | - DUCONGE F; TOULME JJ, "In vitro selection identifies key determinants for loop-loop interactions: RNA aptamers selective for the TAR RNA element of HTV-1", RNA, (199912), vol. 5, no. 12, pages 1605 - 14 | - BOIZIAU C ET AL., "DNA aptamers selected against the HIV-1 trans-activation-responsive RNA element form RNA-DNA kissing complexes", J BID CHEM., (19990430), vol. 274, no. 18, pages 12730 - 7 | - LE TINEVEZ R; MISHRA RK; TOULME JJ., "Selective inhibition of cell-free translation by oligonucleotides targeted to a mRNA hairpin structure", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (19980515), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 2273 - 8 | - HICKE ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2000), vol. 06, page 923 | - RINGQUIST ET AL., CYTOMETRY, (1998), vol. 33, page 394 | - HICKE ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2000), vol. 106, page 923 | - WONG; LOHMAN, PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. 'USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5428 - 5432 | - CACECI, M. ET AL., BYTE, (1984), vol. 9, pages 340 - 362 | - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, page 12997 | - DAVIS ET AL., RNA World, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1993), page 185 | - WERSTUCK ET AL., SCIENDE, (1998), vol. 282, page 296 | - CHASE ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1986), vol. 56, page 103 | - EICHORN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1968), vol. 90, page 7323 | - DALE ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1975), vol. 14, page 2447 | - LIPPARD ET AL., ACC. CHEM. RES., (1978), vol. 11, page 211 | - XIA ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 37, page 14719 | - EGUCHI ET AL., "Antigensis RNA", ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1991), vol. 60, page 631 | - OKANO, J., NEUROCHEIN, (1991), vol. 56, page 560 | - MANOHARAN, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1999), vol. 1489, page 117 | - HERDEWIJA, ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEVELOPMENT, (2000), vol. 10, page 297 | - MAIER ET AL., ORGANIC LETTERS, (2000), vol. 2, page 1819 | - "Pibozyme Protocols", Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (1997), vol. 74 | - NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, page 1497 | - QIN ET AL., ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV., (2000), vol. 10, page 11 | - SUMMERTON, ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV., (1997), vol. 7, page 187 | - SUMMERTON ET AL., ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV., (1997), vol. 7, page 63 | - TAYLOR ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, page 17445 | - PARTRIDGE ET AL., ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV., (1996), vol. 6, page 169 | - NIELSEN ET AL., J BIOMOL STRUCT DYN, (1999), vol. 17, page 175 | - PETERSEN ET AL., J MOL RECOGNIT, (2000), vol. 13, page 44 | - NIELSEN ET AL., BIOCONJUG CHERN, (2000), vol. 11, page 228 | - FRONTIERS IN BIOSCIENCE, vol. 4, (19991101), pages D782 - 786, URL: www.bioscience.org/1999/v4/d/soomets/fulltet.htm | - "Antisense Research and Application", Boca Raton, CRC PRESS, pages 363 - 373 | - HYRUP, B. ET AL., "Modification of the binding affinity of peptide nucleic acids (PNA). PNA with extended backbones consisting of 2-Aminoethyl--Alamne or 3-Aminopropylglycine units", J. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMMUN., (1993), pages 519 - 519 | - DEMIDOV, V. ET AL., "Sequence selective double strand DNA cleavage by PNA targeting using nuclease S1", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2103 - 2107 | - NIELSEN, P.E., "Peptide Nucleic Acid (PNA) A model structure for the primordial genetic material", ORIGINS OF LIFE, (1993), vol. 23, pages 323 - 327 | - EGHOLM, M. ET AL., "Peptide nucleic acids containing adenine or guanine recognize thymine and cytosine in complementary DNA sequences", J. CHEM. SOC. CHEN. COMMUN, (1993), pages 800 - 801 | - KIM, S.K. ET AL., "Right-handed triplex formed between peptide nucleic acid PNA-T8 and poly(dA) shown by linear and circular dichroism spectroscopy", J. AMER. CHEN. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, pages 6477 - 6481 | - EGHOLM, M. ET AL., "PNA hybridizes to complementary oligonucleotides obeying the Watson-Crick hydrogen bonding rules", NATURE, (1993), vol. 365, pages 556 - 568 | - BUCHARDT, 0. ET AL., "Peptide Nucleic Acids (PNA) and their potential applications in medicine and biotechnology", TRENDS BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, pages 384 - 386 | - ALDRIAN-HERRADA, G. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1998), vol. 26, page 4920 | - PARDRIDGE, W. ET AL., PNAS, (1995), vol. 92, pages 5592 - 5596 | - CHINNERY, P. F. ET AL., GENE THER., (1999), vol. 6, pages 1919 - 28 | - SCARFI, S. ET AL., "Synthesis, uptake, and intracellular metabolism of a hydrophobic tetrapeptide- peptide nucleic acid (PNA)-biotin molecule", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1997), vol. 236, pages 323 - 326 | - BIOCONJUGATE CHEM, (1997), vol. 8, pages 481 - 499 | - NIELSEN, P. E. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - EGHOLM, M. ET AL., "Peptide nucleic acids (PNA). Oligonucleotide analogues with an achiral peptide backbone", JAM CHEM SOC, (1992), vol. 114, pages 1895 - 1897 | - NIELSEN, P. E.; M. EGHOLM; O. BUCHARDT, "Peptide nucleic acid (PNA). A DNA mimic with a peptide backbone", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY 5, (1994), pages 3 - 7 | - EGHOLM, M. ET AL., "Recognition of guanine and adenine in DNA by cytosine and thymine containing peptide nucleic acid", JAM CHEM SOC, (1992), vol. 114, pages 9677 - 9678 | - EGHOLM, M. ET AL., "PNA hybridizes to complementary oligonucleotides obeying the Watson-Crick hydrogen-bonding rules [see comments]", NATURE, (1993), vol. 365, pages 566 - 568 | - WITTUNG, P. ET AL., "DNA- like double helix formed by peptide nucleic acid", NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 561 - 563 | - BROWN, S. C. ET AL., "NMR solution structure of a peptide nucleic acid complexed with RNA", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 777 - 780 | - DEMIDOV, V. V. ET AL., "Stability of peptide nucleic acids in human serum and cellular extracts", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1994), vol. 48, pages 1310 - 1313 | - PEFFER, N. J. ET AL., "Strand-invasion of duplex DNA by peptide nucleic acid oligomers", PROC NAT ACAD SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 10648 - 10652 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1998), vol. 54, pages 3607 - 3630 | - HWANG ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, page 12997 | - SULLENGER ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1990), vol. 10, page 6512 | - RUSCONI ET AL., THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (2000), vol. 83, pages 841 - 848 | - WARKENTIN ET AL., THROMB HAEMOST, (1998), vol. 79, pages 1 - 7 | - WARKENTIN ET AL., THRAMB HAEMOST, (1998), vol. 79, pages 1 - 7 | - GREINACHER ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1999), vol. 99, pages 73 - 80 | - LEWIS ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 103, pages 1838 - 1843 | - ORTEL ET AL., THROMB HAEMOST, (1992), vol. 67, pages 292 - 296 | US19900536428 | US19920931473 |