EP2081230 - Photodetecting device, radiation detecting device, and radiation imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mochizuki, Chiori c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2012/06] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
Mochizuki, Chiori c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/06] |
Former [2009/30] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156255.3 | 27.03.2002 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | JP20010093002 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001093002 | JP20010142005 | 11.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001142005 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2081230 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2081230 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2081230 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
H01L27/14603 (EP,US);
H01L27/14658 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/30] | Title | German: | Fotoempfangende Vorrichtung, Strahlungsdetektor, und Strahlungsabbildungssystem | [2009/30] | English: | Photodetecting device, radiation detecting device, and radiation imaging system | [2009/30] | French: | Dispositif de photodétection, dispositif de détecteur de radiation, et système d'imagerie de radiation | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 18.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02007020.7 / EP1246250 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020007020) is 23.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | FR | 10.04.2012 | GB | 08.05.2012 | [2013/21] |
Former [2013/07] | IT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
FR | 10.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | IT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 08.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5869837 (HUANG ZHONG [CA]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 9; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0964451 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US6011274 (GU TIEER [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 8, lines 61-64; figures 1,4-7 * | by applicant | US5869837 |