EP2065015 - Stent-graft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2015/19] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states William A. Cook Australia Pty Ltd 12 Electronic Street Brisbane Technology Park Eight Mile Plains Brisbane, Queensland 4113 / AU | ||
For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | |||
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states William A. Cook Australia Pty Ltd 12 Electronic Street Brisbane Technology Park Eight Mile Plains Brisbane, Queensland 4113 / AU | ||
For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC P.O. Box 2269 Bloomington, IN 47402 / US | |||
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states William A. Cook Australia Pty Ltd 12 Electronic Street Brisbane Technology Park Eight Mile Plains Brisbane, Queensland 4113 / AU | ||
For all designated states WILLIAM COOK EUROPE ApS Sandet 6 4632 Bjaeverskov / DK | |||
For all designated states Cook Incorporated 750 North Daniel's Way, P.O. Box 489 Bloomington, Indiana 47402-0489 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartley, David Ernest 2 View Street Subiaco, Western Australia / AU | 02 /
Lawrence-Brown, Michael 36 Shann Street Floreat, Western Australia 6014 / AU | 03 /
Stelter, Wolfe Talstrasse 1 65812, Bad Soden / DE | 04 /
Ivancev, Krasnodar Bredg. 9 B 222 21, Lund / SE | 05 /
Verhoeven, Eric Martinikerkhof 6 Groningen, 9712 JG / AU | [2015/14] |
Former [2009/23] | 01 /
Hartley, David Ernest 2 View Street Subiaco, Western Australia / AU | ||
02 /
Lawrence-Brown, Michael 36 Shann Street Floreat, Western Australia 6014 / AU | |||
03 /
Stelter, Wolfe Talstrasse 1 65812, Bad Soden / DE | |||
04 /
Ivancev, Krasnodar Bredg. 9 B S-222 21, Lund / SE | |||
05 /
Verhoeven, Eric Martinikerkhof 6 Groningen, 9712 JG / AU | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Jehan, Robert Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | ||
Former [2009/23] | Jehan, Robert Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09156931.9 | 05.04.2004 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | US20030460291P | 03.04.2003 Original published format: US 460291 P | US20030510244P | 10.10.2003 Original published format: US 510244 P | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065015 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2065015 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/07, A61F2/954 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
A61F2/954 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/9517 (EP,US);
A61F2/89 (EP,US);
A61F2002/061 (EP,US);
A61F2002/067 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2002/821 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2250/006 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stent-Transplantat | [2009/23] | English: | Stent-graft | [2009/23] | French: | Stent-greffe | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04749755.7 / EP1608293 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040749755) is 24.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2004 | AT | 24.06.2015 | BE | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | ES | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | IT | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | SE | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.04.2004 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
GR | 25.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO03082153 (COOK INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,4,5 * page 16, paragraph 6 - page 17, paragraph 2; figure 12 *; | [A]EP1157674 (MEDINOL LTD [IL]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020]; figure 21 *; | [A]WO9913808 (WISSELINK WILLEM [NL]) [A] 1-10 * page 11, line 10 - page 14, line 12; figures 1a-1f *; | [A]US2002169497 (WHOLEY PETRA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0002]; figures 3,6,7 *; | [A]WO9709007 (ANSON MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 5; figures 4-6 * | by applicant | US5387235 | US5720776 | WO9853761 | WO03034948 | WO2010034948 | US6206931 | WO2004002365 | US2003120332 | WO03053287 | WO2010053287 | WO2004017868 | WO9853716 | WO2004017867 | US20030602930 | AU2004PS03215 | AU2004PR09617 | US20020392667 |