EP2107163 - Traffic barrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colombo, Giovanni Via Ca' de Volpi, 2 24034 Cisano Bergamasco (BG) / IT | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Vanosi, Adelio Valeriano GIAMBROCONO & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Vanosi, Adelio Valeriano GIAMBROCONO & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09157230.5 | 02.04.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | IT2008MI00592 | 04.04.2008 Original published format: IT MI20080592 | [2009/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2107163 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2107163 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E01F13/04, E01F15/12 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
E01F13/048 (EP);
E01F15/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verkehrsabsperrung | [2009/41] | English: | Traffic barrier | [2009/41] | French: | Barrière de trafic | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]FR2642097 (MASAIR [FR]) [X] 1,5,6,12 * figure - * * page 2, lines 4-10 * * page 3, lines 25-31 * * page 4, lines 20-25, 32-34 * [Y] 11 [I] 7-10,14; | [XI]DE10144276 (HIPP GEORG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,13 * figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0036] , [0046] , [0047] * [I] 7,9,10,14; | [XI]WO02097196 (CEMI AUTOMAZIONI S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,14 * figure 1 * * page 3, lines 25-34 * * page 4, lines 20-24 * [I] 10; | [XI]US5217318 (PEPPEL GEORGE W [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,4 * [I] 7,9,10,14; | [Y]EP0438267 (ROADS CORP [AU]) [Y] 11 * figure 2 * * column 3, lines 29-31 * |