EP2074973 - Activity ostomy bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states COLOPLAST A/S Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersen, Birthe Vestbo Hovgaardsvej 3B 3060, Espergaerde / DK | 02 /
Hansen, Soeren Hobrovej 41 3000, Helsingoer / DK | [2009/27] | Application number, filing date | 09157251.1 | 08.09.2005 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | DK20040001358 | 08.09.2004 Original published format: DK 200401358 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2074973 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/445 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
A61F5/4407 (EP,US);
A61F5/443 (US);
A61F5/44 (US);
A61F5/4404 (US);
A61F5/445 (EP,US);
A61F2005/4402 (US);
A61F2005/4415 (US);
B65D33/1616 (US);
B65D33/165 (US);
B65D33/246 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | Aktivitäts-Ostomiebeutel | [2009/27] | English: | Activity ostomy bag | [2009/27] | French: | Poche collectrice pour stomie | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05777868.0 / EP1791503 | Divisional application(s) | EP10179827.0 / EP2275059 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4955879 (MERVINE JEANNE A [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5279603 (EVERETT DENNIS K [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0729733 (BRAUN BIOTROL B [FR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 15; figure - *; | [A]WO02102289 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 25; figure - * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 29 *; | [A]EP1378218 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 13, line 25 - line 53; figure - * | by applicant | US4367732 | US5051259 | WO9318725 | WO9418919 | US5714225 | US5800415 | EP1378218 |