EP2112324 - Ring member for swellable apparatus, assembly and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford U.K. Limited Gotham Road East Leake Loughborough Leicestershire LE12 6JX / GB | [2017/33] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Swelltec Limited Weatherford House Lawson Drive Dyce Aberdeen AB21 0DR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nutley, Kim 19 Cairn Seat Inverurie Aberdeenshire AB51 5JH / GB | 02 /
Nutley, Brian 9 Grandholm Gardens Grandholm Village Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB22 8AG / GB | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Docherty, Andrew John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Lincoln, Matthew, et al Lincoln ip Riverside House Riverside Drive Aberdeen AB11 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09157795.7 | 09.04.2009 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | GB20080007310 | 22.04.2008 Original published format: GB 0807310 | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2112324 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/12, E21B33/127 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
E21B33/1208 (EP,GB,US);
E21B17/02 (GB);
E21B17/10 (GB);
E21B33/1216 (EP,US);
E21B43/08 (GB);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ringelement für eine anschwellbare Vorrichtung, Anordnung und Verfahren | [2009/44] | English: | Ring member for swellable apparatus, assembly and method | [2009/44] | French: | Élément en anneau pour appareil gonflable, ensemble et procédé | [2009/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/03] | Divisional application(s) | EP12171408.3 / EP2508706 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2945541 (MALY GEORGE P, et al); | [A]GB2248255 (SOLINST CANADA LTD [CA]); | [X]US2005110217 (WOOD EDWARD T [US], et al); | [PA]WO2008089115 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) | Examination | US2144026 | US2007151724 | by applicant | US2945541 | US2005110217 | GB2411918 | WO2006115417 | WO2008062178 |