EP2076082 - Downlink power control with limit to dynamic range using detection of downlink transmit power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koo, Chang-Soo 281 Altessa Blvd. Melville, NY 11747 / US | 02 /
Shin, Sung-Hyuk 104 Eidner Way Northvale, NJ 07647 / US | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Nordin, Magnus Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2009/27] | Application number, filing date | 09157853.4 | 29.07.2004 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | US20030491187P | 30.07.2003 Original published format: US 491187 P | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2076082 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2076082 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/00, H04W80/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
H04W52/362 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2631 (KR);
H04W52/143 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/34 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | H04W52/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | Abwärtsstrecken-Leistungssteuerung mit Begrenzung auf einen dynamischen Bereich durch Erkennung einer Abwärtsstrecken-Übertragungsleistung | [2009/27] | English: | Downlink power control with limit to dynamic range using detection of downlink transmit power | [2009/27] | French: | Commande de puissance en liaison descendante avec limitation de la plage dynamique utilisant la détection de la puissance de transmission en liaison descendante | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 08.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04779502.6 / EP1665574 | EP07111003.5 / EP1830480 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040779502) is 21.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19938494 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 42 - column 4, line 13 * * column 5, lines 4-32 *; | [A]EP1164714 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0010] - [0017] - [0021] - [0026] *; | [A]EP1237296 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0023] - [0025] - [0037]; figures 3,4; claim 1 * |