EP2110749 - Method for controlling connection pins of an emulation-capable component and assembly to carry out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Göpel electronic GmbH Göschwitzer Strasse 58/60 07745 Jena / DE | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Mario Im Plotz 9 07751 Milda / DE | [2015/02] |
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
Berger, Mario Buchaer Straße 8 07745 Jena / DE | Representative(s) | Oehmke, Volker, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | [2015/02] |
Former [2009/43] | Oehmke, Volker, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen, Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 09157952.4 | 15.04.2009 | [2009/43] | Priority number, date | DE20081019861 | 17.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008019861 | [2009/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2110749 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2110749 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110749 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/267, G01R31/3185 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
G06F11/267 (EP);
G01R31/318586 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/43] | G06F11/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern von Anschlusspins eines emulationsfähigen Bausteins und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2009/43] | English: | Method for controlling connection pins of an emulation-capable component and assembly to carry out the method | [2009/43] | French: | Procédé de commande de puces de connexion d'un module pouvant émulsifier et agencement destiné à l'exécution du procédé | [2009/43] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 21.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2009 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | ES | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | IT | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | AT | 15.04.2015 | IE | 15.04.2015 | LU | 15.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | PT | 07.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.04.2009 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 15.04.2015 | ||
LU | 15.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
PT | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 15.04.2015 | ||
LU | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 15.04.2015 | ||
LU | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 15.04.2015 | ||
LU | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 07.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006008721 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 28 * * page 4, line 10 - line 19 * * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 9; figure 1 *; | [XA]DE102005039347 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 10 * * page 3, paragraph 15 * * page 4, paragraph 35 - page 5, paragraph 38; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 2-7; | [A]US2006059387 (SWOBODA GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 3, paragraph 82 * * page 4, paragraph 96 - page 5, paragraph 107 * * page 6, paragraph 122 - page 9, paragraph 168; figures 44,45,46,49,50,52 * | by applicant | US6842865 | GB2350215 | DE69314683T |