EP2110363 - Mobile plant and process for treating aqueous streams from purging or cleaning steam generator circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEOLIA EAU - COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES EAUX 52, rue d'Anjou 75008 Paris / FR | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paillard, Hervé L'Embrunchère 86340 Vernon / FR | 02 /
De Bénédittis Jérôme 10 rue Léon Fabre 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 03 /
Bonnefoy, Joseph Rue des Chênes Verts 26120 Montmeyran / FR | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Cardy, Sophie Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Cardy, Sophie Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09158106.6 | 17.04.2009 | [2009/43] | Priority number, date | FR20080052638 | 18.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0852638 | [2009/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110363 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110363 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C02F9/00, // C02F101/10, C02F1/04, C02F1/44, C02F101/16, C02F1/66, C02F101/30, C02F103/02, B01D61/02 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
B01D61/025 (EP,US);
C02F1/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/66 (EP,US);
C02F2101/101 (EP,US);
C02F2101/105 (EP,US);
C02F2101/16 (EP,US);
C02F2101/301 (EP,US);
C02F2101/303 (EP,US);
C02F2103/023 (EP,US);
C02F2201/008 (EP,US);
C02F2303/24 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/43] | C02F1/44, C02F1/04, C02F1/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | Mobile Anlage und Verfahren zur Behandlung wässriger Ströme aus einem Dampferzeuger oder entstanden durch Reinigung davon | [2009/43] | English: | Mobile plant and process for treating aqueous streams from purging or cleaning steam generator circuits | [2009/43] | French: | Procédé de traitement des effluents aqueux de purge ou de nettoyage des circuits de générateurs de vapeur et unité mobile permettant la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [2009/43] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2013 | 21.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2009 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | ES | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | IT | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | PL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.04.2009 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4983302 (BALINT TIBOR [HU], et al) [Y] 13-14 * column 3, line 6 - line 26; figure 2 * * column 3, line 55 - line 63 *; | [Y]DE19901571 (UWATECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 3 - line 4; figure 1 * * page 2, line 42 - line 59 *; | [X]WO2004099087 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 1; figures 1-3; claims 1-9 * * page 8, paragraph 3 *; | [X]WO2005009908 (OTV SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure 1; example 1 * * page 7, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [X]US2005211632 (HUNG NAN-HSIUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1; figure 2 * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 3 * * page 3, paragraph 30 - paragraph 36 *; | [X]US2006201882 (CHEN HSIAO-YU [TW], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 1,3; claims 1-12 *; | [Y]EP1734013 (ADLER HERWIG [AT]) [Y] 1-14 * column 9, paragraph 28; figure 1; claims 1-8 * * column 4, paragraph 14 ** column 6, paragraph 21 - paragraph 22 * |