EP2111738 - Fluid cooler located in an air stream of a work assembly of an agricultural combine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marvin, Paul D / 1300 Forest Court DeWitt, IA 52742 / US | 02 /
Turigliatti, Jeffrey A / 53 W Rose Court Geneseo, IL 61254 / US | 03 /
Adamson, James, K. / 3 Chrisop Court Colona, IL 61241 / US | 04 /
Van Hal, Todd E. / 810 West Pine Street Eldridge, IA 52748 / US | 05 /
Pierce, Johann H. / 919 Springbrook Ln. DeWitt, IA 52742 / US | 06 /
Kenyon, Peter E. / 2321 Fulton Ave. Davenport, IA 52803 / US | [2012/18] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
Marvin, Paul D 1300 Forest Court DeWitt, IA 52742 / US | ||
02 /
Turigliatti, Jeffrey A 53 W Rose Court Geneseo, IL 61254 / US | |||
03 /
Adamson, James, K. 3 Chrisop Court Colona, IL 61241 / US | |||
04 /
Van Hal, Todd E. 810 West Pine Street Eldridge, IA 52748 / US | |||
05 /
Pierce, Johann H. 919 Springbrook Ln. DeWitt, IA 52742 / US | |||
06 /
Kenyon, Peter E. 2321 Fulton Ave. Davenport, IA 52803 / US | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09158122.3 | 17.04.2009 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | US20080108576 | 24.04.2008 Original published format: US 108576 | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2111738 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2111738 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/12, A01D41/127, A01D69/03, A01F12/44 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
A01D41/12 (EP,US);
A01D41/1243 (EP,US);
A01F12/444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | Fluidkühler, der in einem Luftstrom einer Arbeitsbaueinheit eines Mähdreschers angeordnet ist | [2009/44] | English: | Fluid cooler located in an air stream of a work assembly of an agricultural combine | [2009/44] | French: | Refroidisseur de fluide dans le flux d'air d'un ensemble de travail d'une moissonneuse-batteuse agricole | [2009/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2009 | AT | 02.05.2012 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | HR | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | MC | 02.05.2012 | MK | 02.05.2012 | MT | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | NO | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 02.05.2012 | ||
MK | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | |
NO | 02.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3384232 (TURNBULL GLEN O, et al) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 67; figure - *; | [XA]US3727712 (COLLOTON M) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 51; figure - * [A] 12; | [A]US4489734 (VAN OVERSCHELDE DANIEL M [BE]) [A] 1,7* column 8, line 1 - line 7; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US6500064 (SCHRATTENECKER FRANZ [AT]) [A] 1,7 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [XA]US2007039302 (VELKE JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036]; figures 5,6 * [A] 12; | [A]US7354341 (SMITH DWAYNE B [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 21 - column 7, line 64; figure - * | by applicant | US3384232 |