EP2244544 - Hardware module and backplane board for an IED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gloor, Mathias Horniweg 294 CH-4814, Bottenwil / CH | 02 /
Borner, Christian Burgmattweg 4 CH-5213, Villnachern / CH | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
Gloor, Mathias Horniweg 294 CH-4814, Bottenwil / CH | ||
02 /
Borner, Christian Burgmattweg 4 CH-5213, Villnachern / CH | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP) Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2010/43] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP) Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 09158551.3 | 23.04.2009 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2244544 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2244544 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
H05K7/1439 (EP,US);
H05K7/1438 (EP,US);
H05K7/1457 (EP,US);
H05K7/1477 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | Hardwaremodul und Rückwandplatine für USBV | [2010/43] | English: | Hardware module and backplane board for an IED | [2010/43] | French: | Module matériel et panneau arrière pour un dispositif intelligent | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 28.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2009 | AT | 26.10.2011 | BE | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | HR | 26.10.2011 | IT | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MK | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | NO | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | IE | 23.04.2012 | LU | 23.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
LU | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5726635 (TSUHARA KATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* column 5, line 26 - column 15, line 28; figures 1-14 *; | [A]US2002006026 (TAKAHASHI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0151]; figures 1-26C *; | [A]US6650844 (DAVIES BRYAN RUSSELL [AU], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 27 - column 9, line 13; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2007006267 (FUJITSU SIEMENS COMPUTERS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 6 - page 12; figures 1,2 * |