EP2111975 - JOINED COMPOSITE STRUCTURES WITH A GRADED COEFFICIENT OF THERMAL EXPANSION FOR EXTREME ENVIRONMENT APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/44] | Joined composite structures with a graded coefficient of thermal expansion for extreme environment applications | ||
[2016/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yousefiani, Ali 18 Fano Street Unit 9 Arcadia, CA 91006 / US | 02 /
Comfort, John M. 2668 Independence Circle Corona, CA 92882 / US | 03 /
Vollmer, John G. 1924 241st Street Limita, CA 90717 / US | 04 /
Hand, Michael L. 16792 Talisman No 303 Huntington Beach, CA 92649 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
Yousefiani, Ali 18 Fano Street Unit 9 Arcadia, CA 91006 / US | ||
02 /
Comfort, John M. 2668 Independence Circle Corona, CA 92882 / US | |||
03 /
Vollmer, John G. 1924 241st Street Limita, CA 90717 / US | |||
04 /
Hand, Michael L. 16792 Talisman No 303 Huntington Beach, CA 92649 / US | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Howson, Richard G.B., et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/44] | Howson, Richard G.B., et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09158629.7 | 23.04.2009 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | US20080108480 | 23.04.2008 Original published format: US 108480 | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2111975 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2111975 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2111975 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/00, B32B15/00, B32B18/00, B23K1/00, C04B37/00, C04B37/02 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
C04B37/026 (EP,US);
B32B7/027 (EP,US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US);
C04B2235/72 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
C04B2237/122 (EP,US);
C04B2237/123 (EP,US);
C04B2237/403 (EP,US);
C04B2237/405 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/44] | B32B7/00, B32B15/00, B32B18/00, B23K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2009/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBUNDENE VERBUNDSTRUKTUREN MIT EINER ABGESTUFTEN WÄRMEAUSDEHNUNGSKOEFFIZIENT FÜR EXTREMUMGEBUNGSANWENDUNGEN | [2016/09] | English: | JOINED COMPOSITE STRUCTURES WITH A GRADED COEFFICIENT OF THERMAL EXPANSION FOR EXTREME ENVIRONMENT APPLICATIONS | [2016/09] | French: | STRUCTURES COMPOSITES ASSEMBLÉES AVEC UN COEFFICIENT GRADUÉ D'EXPANSION THERMIQUE POUR LES APPLICATIONS EN ENVIRONNEMENT EXTRÊME | [2016/09] |
Former [2009/44] | Verbundene Verbundstrukturen mit einer abgestuften Wärmeausdehnungsziffer für Extremumgebungsanwendungen | ||
Former [2009/44] | Joined composite structures with a graded coefficient of thermal expansion for extreme environment applications | ||
Former [2009/44] | Structures composites assemblées avec un coefficient gradué d'expansion thermique pour les applications d'environnement extrême | Examination procedure | 27.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 12.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2009 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1509644 (JENAER GLAS SCHOTT GEN VEB) [X] 1-5,9-14 * page 1, line 25 - line 31 * * page 2, line 17 - line 46 * * page 3, line 108 - line 123 * * example . * * claims 1-3 *; | [XI]EP0109814 (AE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,8-15 * page 4, line 5 - page 7, line 16 * * figure 1 * * abstract * [I] 7; | [X]EP0459865 (GRUMMAN AEROSPACE CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,9-14 * column 1, line 55 - column 4, line 23 ** column 5, line 5 - line 26 * | Examination | US5881607 |