EP2245975 - Dish-holder support for dishwasher rack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestel Beyaz Esya Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Vestel Beyaz Esya Sanayi Ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Öztop, Özgür Vestel Beyaz Esye-Bulasik Makinasi Fab. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | 02 /
Hülagü, Orhan Vestel Beyaz Esye-Bulasik Makinasi Fab. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2011/40] |
Former [2010/44] | 01 /
Öztop, Özgür Vestel Beyaz Esye-Bulasik Makinasi Fab. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | ||
02 /
Hülagü, Orhan Vestel Beyaz Esye-Bulasik Makinasi Fab. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | Representative(s) | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Inc. Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP 06540 Ankara / TR | [2011/40] |
Former [2010/44] | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Inc. Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP 06540 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 09159145.3 | 30.04.2009 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245975 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2245975 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/50 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
A47L15/503 (EP);
A47L15/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | Geschirrhalterträger für Geschirrkorb einer Geschirrspülmaschine | [2010/44] | English: | Dish-holder support for dishwasher rack | [2010/44] | French: | Support porte-vaisselle pour panier de lave-vaisselle | [2010/44] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz, et al, et al Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Arçelik Anonim Sirketi Ankara Asfalti Uzeri E5, Tuzia 34950 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ, et al, et al Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | 09.08.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.10.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2009 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | HR | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | MK | 05.10.2011 | MT | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | NO | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | LU | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2013 | IE | 30.04.2013 | IT | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | ES | 01.05.2013 | GB | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | [2017/10] |
Former [2017/08] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 05.10.2011 | ||
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
LU | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.04.2013 | ||
IT | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
ES | 01.05.2013 | ||
GB | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2014/37] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 05.10.2011 | ||
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
LU | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.04.2013 | ||
IT | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
ES | 01.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 05.10.2011 | ||
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
LU | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.04.2013 | ||
IT | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
LU | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.04.2013 | ||
IT | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.04.2013 | ||
IT | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
IT | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/14] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4589556 (PERETZ STEVEN I [US]) [Y] 1,3-5 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 14; figure 1 *; | [AD]US2005242046 (LEE KANG H [KR]) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1787569 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [AD] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y]DE102006007330 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 2 * figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2007282755 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | US2005242046 | EP1787569 |