EP2088130 - Transparent glass ceramic darkened with vanadium oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siebers, Friedrich Winzerstraße 7 55283, Nierstein / DE | 02 /
NASS, Peter Obere Bogenstraße 25 55120, Mainz / DE | 03 /
RODEK, Erich Pliniusweg 28 55126, Mainz / DE | [2016/08] |
Former [2009/33] | 01 /
Siebers, Friedrich Winzerstraße 7 55283, Nierstein / DE | ||
02 /
NASS, Peter Obere Bogenstraße 25 55120, Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
RODEK, Erich Pliniusweg 28 55126, Mainz / DE | Representative(s) | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bahnhofstraße 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Bahnhofstraße 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2009/33] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Söhnleinstraße 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 09159554.6 | 24.08.2000 | [2009/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2088130 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2088130 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/085, C03C3/087, C03C4/08, C03C4/10, C03C10/14, C03C4/02 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
C03C10/0027 (EP,US);
C03C3/085 (EP,US);
C03C3/087 (EP,US);
C03C4/02 (EP,US);
C03C4/08 (EP,US);
C03C4/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/33] | C03C3/12, C03C4/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2016/08] |
Former [2009/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Transparente, mit Vanadiumoxid-Zusatz dunkel eingefärbte Glaskeramik | [2009/33] | English: | Transparent glass ceramic darkened with vanadium oxide | [2009/33] | French: | Vitrocéramique transparente foncée à l'aide d'oxyde de vanadium | [2009/33] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00954649.0 / EP1313675 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000954649) is 28.06.2005 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | ES | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | IT | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | SE | 24.02.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | AT | 24.08.2016 | GB | 24.08.2016 | IE | 24.08.2016 | LU | 24.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/49] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
GB | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 24.08.2016 | ||
LU | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
GB | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 24.08.2016 | ||
LU | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0156479 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11* examples 11,14,16; claims 1-18 *; | [X]DE3703342 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * page 1, line 60 - page 2, line 57; example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US5446008 (KROLLA GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1, lines 7-30 * * column 5, line 46 - column 7, line 25 * * figures 3,4; examples 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [X]JPH11100229 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0010] - [0016] , [0019] , [0022] , [0023]; examples 1,3; claims 1,2 *; | [X]JPH11100231 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0009] - [0012] , [0017] , [0020] , [0023] , [0024]; examples 1,3; claims 1-3 *; | [X]JPH11100230 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [X] 1-3,5-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0009] - [0016] , [0022] , [0023]; example 3; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0156479 | EP0220333 | EP0437228 | DE3703342 | US5446008 | JPH09169542 | JPH11100229 | JPH11100230 |