EP2136062 - Improvements Relating to Fuel Injector Control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi International Operations Luxembourg S.à r.l. Avenue de Luxembourg 4940 Bascharage / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Delphi International Operations Luxembourg S.à.r.l. Avenue de Luxembourg 4940 Bascharage / LU | ||
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies Holding S.à.r.l. Avenue de Luxembourg 4940 Bascharage / LU | ||
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O.Box 5052 Troy MI 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hardy, Martin 71 Cedar Grove Hempstead, Gillingham, Kent ME7 3QZ / GB | 02 /
Tolliday, Adrian 15 Cameron Close Chatham, Kent ME5 0DD / GB | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | BorgWarner France SAS Campus Saint Christophe Bâtiment Galilée 2 10, avenue de l'Entreprise 95863 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Neill, Andrew Peter, et al Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham, Kent ME8 0RU / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Gregory, John David Charles, et al Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham Kent ME8 0RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09159694.0 | 07.05.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | EP20080156989 | 27.05.2008 Original published format: EP 08156989 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136062 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/20 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
F02D41/2096 (EP,US);
H02N2/065 (EP,US);
F02D2041/201 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2027 (EP,US);
F02D41/402 (EP,US);
F02M2200/703 (EP,US);
F02M51/0603 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Extension states | AL | 23.06.2010 | BA | 23.06.2010 | RS | 23.06.2010 | Title | German: | Verbesserungen einer Steuerung von Kraftstoffeinspritzdüsen | [2009/52] | English: | Improvements Relating to Fuel Injector Control | [2009/52] | French: | Améliorations d'une commande d'injecteur de carburant | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19636088 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [A] 1-6,12-14 * figures 3-6 *; | [A]DE19714607 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 4-5* figure 4 *; | [XAI]DE19921456 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 22 - line 40; figures 2,4 * * column 2, line 44 - line 51 * * column 3, line 20 - line 27; figures 2,3 * [A] 5 [I] 6-10; | [XI]EP1138903 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-2,12-14 * figures 6, 12-13 * [I] 4; | [X]DE10158553 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,12-14 * figure 15 *; | [X]DE102004026250 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,12-14 * paragraph [0058]; figure 10 *; | [XAI]WO2005061876 (VOLKSWAGEN MECHATRONIC GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,12-14 * page 14; figures 1,2A * [A] 5 [I] 7-9,11; | [A]DE102005046933 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1895133 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure 3 * | Examination | EP1860307 | EP1923559 | EP2037109 | by applicant | EP0995901 | EP1174615 | EP1860307 |