EP2117275 - Method and apparatus for transitioning from a first rat to a second rat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2018/01] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberts, Gideon Edmund Albert House, 92-93 Edward Street Birmingham, West Midlands B1 2RA / GB | 02 /
Saini, Sukhdev Albert House, 92-93 Edward Street Birmingham, West Midlands B1 2RA / GB | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/01] |
Former [2012/35] | Addison, Ann Bridget Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/46] | Barrett, Peter Andrew John Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09159767.4 | 08.05.2009 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | US20080052085P | 09.05.2008 Original published format: US 52085 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117275 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117275 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Übergang von einer Erst-Funkzugangstechnologie zu einer Zweit-Funkzugangstechnologie | [2009/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for transitioning from a first rat to a second rat | [2009/46] | French: | Procédé et appareil de transition entre une première technologie d'accès radio (RAT) et une deuxième technologie d'accès radio | [2009/46] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 21.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2009 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | MK | 03.01.2018 | NL | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | NO | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | IE | 08.05.2018 | LU | 08.05.2018 | MT | 08.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 08.05.2009 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
MT | 08.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
MT | 08.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
MT | 08.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 03.01.2018 | |
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0103459 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 19 - line 23 * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 14 * * claims 1,6,9,12,13,15 *; | [X]US2004116110 (AMERGA MESSAY [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] * * claims 1,13,17 *; | [X]EP1610584 (SFR SA [FR]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062] * * claims 1,8,12,16 *; | [A]US2007173283 (LIVET CATHERINE M [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * claims 1-3,9,10 ** figures 2,4 *; | [X]US2007207824 (BHATTACHARJEE SUPRATIK [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0071] * | by applicant | US2004116110 | EP1610584 |