EP2120168 - Computer aided design of three-dimensional cartons with curved creases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esko Software BV Raymonde de Larochelaan 13 9051 Gent / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states Esko Software BV Raymonde de Larochelaan 13 9051 GHENT / BE | ||
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states ESKO SOFTWARE BVBA Kortrijksesteenweg 1095 9051 Gent / BE | ||
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Esko IP NV Kortrijksesteenweg 1095 9051 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Llewelyn John Esko-Graphics Inc 14 Highmoor Dr. Wilbraham, MA 01095 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co. Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 09159828.4 | 08.05.2009 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | US20080051615P | 08.05.2008 Original published format: US 51615 P | US20090433820 | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 433820 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120168 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, G06T17/40 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
G06T19/00 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (EP,US);
G06F2113/20 (EP,US);
G06T2219/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Computerunterstütztes Entwerfen von dreidimensionalen Kisten mit gekrümmten Falten | [2009/47] | English: | Computer aided design of three-dimensional cartons with curved creases | [2009/47] | French: | Design assisté par ordinateur de cartons tridimensionnels avec plieuses courbées | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/17] | 19.04.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.03.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/17] | Appeal following examination | 20.06.2016 | Appeal received No. T2092/16 | 09.08.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US7346408 (VAN BAEL KRISTIAAN K A [BE], et al) [DX] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * column 3, paragraph 4 - column 4, paragraph 2 *; | [DX]US2005157342 (BRU FRANKY [BE]) [DX] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1217067 (MARDON SON & HALL LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2007023987 (KLING DANIEL H [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0092] * | [A] - FARINA J ET AL, "Automatic Segmentation of Rotary Dies for the Production of Corrugated Cardboard Boxes", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, 2005. ISIE 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE INTER NATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON DUBROVNIK, CROATIA JUNE 20-23, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050620), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7803-8738-6, pages 1359 - 1364, XP010850291 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISIE.2005.1529130 | [PA] - MARTIN KILIAN, SIMON FLÖRY, ZHONGGUI CHEN, NILOY MITRA, ALLA SHEFFER, HELMUT POTTMANN, "Curved Folding", ACM TRANSACTION ON GRAPHICS, New York, USA, vol. 27, no. 3, (200808), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/1370000/1360674/a75-kilian.pdf?key1=1360674&key2=1948770521&coll=GUIDE&dl=GUIDE&CFID=49358192&CFTOKEN=69463726, (20090817), XP002542379 [PA] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1360612.1360674 |